This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 09/01/2021 at 01:06:13 (UTC).

BERNARD-VEGA, ELIUD vs PENSACOLA CARE, INCORPORATED

Case Summary

On 07/15/2020 BERNARD-VEGA, ELIUD filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PENSACOLA CARE, INCORPORATED. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Criminal Court Annex located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Valkenburg, V.. Miriam and Valkenburg, Miriam. V.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1198

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Valkenburg, V.. Miriam

Valkenburg, Miriam. V.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BERNARD-VEGA, ELIUD

Tampa, FL 33616

Defendants

PENSACOLA CARE, INCORPORATED

4300 Bayou Blvd., Suite 30 Registered Agent

Pensacola, FL 32503

HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY DEVELOPMENTAL CENTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

SMITH , JOSHUA SCOTT

Attorney at MCINTYRE THANASIDES BRINGGOLD ELLIOTT

4301 West Boy Scout Boulevbard Suite 400

Tampa, FL 33607

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/15/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

07/15/2020: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

DEFENDANT NOTICE OF HEARING

09/11/2020: DEFENDANT NOTICE OF HEARING

MOTION TO SET ASIDE

08/13/2020: MOTION TO SET ASIDE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

08/13/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

08/12/2020: DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

08/11/2020: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

07/22/2020: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

07/16/2020: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED CIVIL INDIGENT APPLICATION/FEE WAIVER

07/15/2020: E-FILED CIVIL INDIGENT APPLICATION/FEE WAIVER

CIVIL AFFIDAVIT APPL INDIGENT STATUS - INDIGENT

07/15/2020: CIVIL AFFIDAVIT APPL INDIGENT STATUS - INDIGENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2020
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Judge: Valkenburg, Miriam V.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: BERNARD-VEGA, ELIUD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT NOTICE OF HEARING; Additional Info: Defendant: PENSACOLA CARE, INCORPORATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: BERNARD-VEGA, ELIUD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Comment: AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES; Additional Info: Defendant: PENSACOLA CARE, INCORPORATED; Defendant Doing Business As: HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY DEVELOPMENTAL CENTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS; Additional Info: Defendant: PENSACOLA CARE, INCORPORATED; Defendant Doing Business As: HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY DEVELOPMENTAL CENTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO SET ASIDE; Comment: OR VACATE CLERK'S DEFAULT AND MOTION TO QUASH PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Additional Info: Defendant: PENSACOLA CARE, INCORPORATED; Defendant Doing Business As: HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY DEVELOPMENTAL CENTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK; Additional Info: Defendant: PENSACOLA CARE, INCORPORATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK; Comment: EXHIBIT(S) ATTACHED; Additional Info: Defendant: PENSACOLA CARE, INCORPORATED

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: BERNARD-VEGA, ELIUD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: BERNARD-VEGA, ELIUD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: BERNARD-VEGA, ELIUD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: BERNARD-VEGA, ELIUD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: BERNARD-VEGA, ELIUD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED CIVIL INDIGENT APPLICATION/FEE WAIVER; Additional Info: Plaintiff: BERNARD-VEGA, ELIUD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL AFFIDAVIT APPL INDIGENT STATUS - INDIGENT; Comment: AMENDED CASE 20CC41198

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: BERNARD-VEGA, ELIUD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED CIVIL INDIGENT APPLICATION/FEE WAIVER; Additional Info: Plaintiff: BERNARD-VEGA, ELIUD

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PENSACOLA CARE, INCORPORATED is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SMITH , JOSHUA SCOTT