This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 03/15/2023 at 03:35:00 (UTC).

Benchmark International Company Sales Specialist, LLC vs Schulte, Christopher M.

Case Summary

On 03/10/2021 Benchmark International Company Sales Specialist, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Schulte, Christopher M. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Farfante, D. Darren, Farfante, Darren. D and Barbas, Rex. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2145

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Farfante, D. Darren

Farfante, Darren. D

Barbas, Rex

 

Party Details

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff

Benchmark International Company Sales Specialist, LLC

4488 West Boy Scout Blvd. 4Th Floor

Tampa, FL 33607

Defendants and Counter Plaintiffs

Pensacola Apothecary, Inc.

6506 N. Davis Highway

Pensacola, FL 32504

Schulte, Christopher M.

Pensacola, FL 32504

Everwell Specialty Pharmacy, LLC

6506 N. Davis Highway

Pensacola, FL 32504

The Christopher M. Schulte 2012 Irrevocable Trust

6506 N. Davis Highway

Pensacola, FL 32504

E and L Properties, LLC

491 Deer Point Drive

Gulf Breeze, FL 32561

SCHULTE, CHRISTOPHER M

THE CHRISTOPHER M SCHULTE 2012 IRREVOCABLE TRUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PALERMO , ANTHONY JOSEPH

Attorney at HOLLAND & KNIGHT LLP

100 N Tampa St Ste 4100

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant and Counter Plaintiff Attorney

LADOUCUER, TODD M

Attorney at GALLOWAY

Galloway, Johnson, Tompkins, Burr & Smith, A 118 E Garden St

Pensacola, FL 32502

 

Court Documents

MOTION TO COMPEL

11/24/2021: MOTION TO COMPEL

REPLY

06/27/2022: REPLY

RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO

06/16/2022: RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO

AMENDED ORDER

05/24/2022: AMENDED ORDER

ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO - FOR

05/06/2022: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO - FOR

MOTION FOR AWARDING ATTORNEY FEES

02/11/2022: MOTION FOR AWARDING ATTORNEY FEES

ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO - FOR

01/13/2022: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO - FOR

EXHIBIT

12/30/2021: EXHIBIT

REPLY

12/13/2021: REPLY

FINAL JUDGMENT

03/13/2023: FINAL JUDGMENT

ORDER GRANTING

03/09/2023: ORDER GRANTING

STATEMENT

03/03/2023: STATEMENT

RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO

03/06/2023: RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO

MOTION IN LIMINE

03/03/2023: MOTION IN LIMINE

JURY INSTRUCTIONS

03/03/2023: JURY INSTRUCTIONS

JURY INSTRUCTIONS

03/03/2023: JURY INSTRUCTIONS

REQUESTED JURY INSTRUCTIONS

03/03/2023: REQUESTED JURY INSTRUCTIONS

REQUESTED JURY INSTRUCTIONS

03/03/2023: REQUESTED JURY INSTRUCTIONS

235 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • JudgementJudgment Code: FJ; Judgment Description: FINAL JUDGMENT; Judge: Farfante, Darren D

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • HearingJAWS HEARING; Cancelled Comments: Per Judge's Order; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Benchmark International Company Sales Specialist, LLC; Date Signed: 03/09/2023; Judicial Officer:: Farfante, Darren D;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • HearingJAWS HEARING; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Hearing Location: 800 E. Twiggs St. Tampa, FL 33602 Room 508View Case Hearing Notice for Additional Details, as applicable.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Benchmark International Company Sales Specialist, LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT; Comment: OF JOINT PRETRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION IN LIMINE; Additional Info: Defendant: E and L Properties, LLC; Defendant: Everwell Specialty Pharmacy, LLC; Defendant: Pensacola Apothecary, Inc.; Defendant: The Christopher M. Schulte 2012 Irrevocable Trust;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJURY INSTRUCTIONS; Additional Info: Defendant: E and L Properties, LLC; Defendant: Everwell Specialty Pharmacy, LLC; Defendant: Pensacola Apothecary, Inc.; Defendant: Schulte, Christopher M.; Defendant: The Christopher M. Schulte 2012 Irrevocable Trust;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJURY INSTRUCTIONS; Additional Info: Defendant: E and L Properties, LLC; Defendant: Everwell Specialty Pharmacy, LLC; Defendant: Pensacola Apothecary, Inc.; Defendant: Schulte, Christopher M.; Defendant: The Christopher M. Schulte 2012 Irrevocable Trust;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
272 More Docket Entries
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X5

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X5

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Benchmark International Company Sales Specialist, LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Benchmark International Company Sales Specialist, LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Benchmark International Company Sales Specialist, LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketATTACHMENT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Benchmark International Company Sales Specialist, LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketATTACHMENT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Benchmark International Company Sales Specialist, LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketATTACHMENT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Benchmark International Company Sales Specialist, LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketATTACHMENT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Benchmark International Company Sales Specialist, LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less