This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 05/14/2023 at 06:33:18 (UTC).

Benchmark International Company Sales Specialist, LLC vs Carpet Super Mart, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/24/2022 Benchmark International Company Sales Specialist, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Carpet Super Mart, Inc. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Barbas, Rex. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4322

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Barbas, Rex

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Benchmark International Company Sales Specialist, LLC

Defendants

Carpet Super Mart, Inc.

JORDAN, ARTHUR C., Jr

MOBLEY, JOYCE J.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BUCHHOLZ , DANIEL LEE

BARUCH , JASON HENRY

PALERMO , ANTHONY JOSEPH

KELLEY , ANNE LAWSON

Defendant Attorney

BROWN , ANDREW MELTON

 

Court Documents

REPLY

03/28/2023: REPLY

BRIEF

03/20/2023: BRIEF

ORDER

03/13/2023: ORDER

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

03/02/2023: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

03/02/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF HEARING

03/01/2023: NOTICE OF HEARING

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

02/17/2023: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

BRIEF IN SUPPORT FILED

02/17/2023: BRIEF IN SUPPORT FILED

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

02/16/2023: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2023
  • HearingJAWS HEARING; Hearing Time: 04:00 PM; Hearing Location: 800 E. Twiggs St. Tampa, FL 33602 Room 501View Case Hearing Notice for Additional Details, as applicable.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • JudgementJudgment Code: PSJ; Judgment Description: PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Instrument Number: 2023185776; Judge: Barbas, Rex

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • HearingJAWS HEARING; Hearing Time: 02:00 PM; Hearing Location: 800 E. Twiggs St. Tampa, FL 33602 Room 501View Case Hearing Notice for Additional Details, as applicable.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Benchmark International Company Sales Specialist, LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEF; Comment: IN OPPOSITION TO PLTF PARTIAL MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Additional Info: Defendant: Carpet Super Mart, Inc.; Defendant: JORDAN, ARTHUR C., Jr; Defendant: MOBLEY, JOYCE J.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: AFFIDAVIT OF ARTHUR C JORDAN JR; Additional Info: Defendant: Carpet Super Mart, Inc.; Defendant: JORDAN, ARTHUR C., Jr; Defendant: MOBLEY, JOYCE J.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER; Comment: REQUIRING ELECTRONIC/TELEPHONIC APPEARANCES; Additional Info: Defendant: Carpet Super Mart, Inc.; Defendant: JORDAN, ARTHUR C., Jr; Defendant: MOBLEY, JOYCE J.; Plaintiff: Benchmark International Company Sales Specialist, LLC; Private Attorney: BROWN , ANDREW MELTON; Private Attorney: BUCHHOLZ , DANIEL LEE; Date 2: 03/13/2023; Judicial Officer:: Barbas, Rex;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Defendant: Carpet Super Mart, Inc.; Defendant: JORDAN, ARTHUR C., Jr; Defendant: MOBLEY, JOYCE J.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Defendant: Carpet Super Mart, Inc.; Defendant: JORDAN, ARTHUR C., Jr; Defendant: MOBLEY, JOYCE J.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Benchmark International Company Sales Specialist, LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Benchmark International Company Sales Specialist, LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Benchmark International Company Sales Specialist, LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Benchmark International Company Sales Specialist, LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Benchmark International Company Sales Specialist, LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Benchmark International Company Sales Specialist, LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Comment: OF ADDITIONAL COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES Jason H. Baruch; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Benchmark International Company Sales Specialist, LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less