This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 08/14/2022 at 15:33:14 (UTC).

Becerra, Roymel vs Elite Gunite LLC

Case Summary

On 05/17/2022 Becerra, Roymel filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Elite Gunite LLC. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Peacock, Emily A, Peacock, Emily. A and Peacock, A. Emily. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4110

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Peacock, A. Emily

Peacock, Emily. A

Peacock, Emily A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Becerra, Roymel

Miami, FL 33130

Defendant

Elite Gunite LLC

501 River Side Avenue, Suite 600

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REMER , JASON S

Attorney at REMER & GEORGES-PIERRE, PLLC

44 W Flagler St Ste 2200

Miami, FL 33130

Defendant Attorney

THOMPSON , LAURIE ANN

Attorney at FOWLER WHITE BURNETT

515 N Flagler Dr Ste 2100

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

 

Court Documents

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/17/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

05/17/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

COMPLAINT

05/17/2022: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/17/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

05/18/2022: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

05/18/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

LETTER TO

05/18/2022: LETTER TO

General Differentiated Case Management Order

05/18/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

06/27/2022: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

07/18/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2023
  • HearingDifferentiated Case Management; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Hearing Location: VIRTUAL COURT DATE - HTTPS://ZOOM.US/J/3058068636 MEETING ID: 305-806-8636 NO PASSWORD IS REQUIREDTELEPHONIC HEARING- 1-786-635-1003 SAME CODE AS ZOOM ID Judicial Officer: Peacock, Emily A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: Elite Gunite LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Additional Info: Defendant: Elite Gunite LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER TO; Comment: ATTY RE: SUMMONS FEE jremer@rgpattorneys.com; ng@rgpattorneys.com; pn@rgpattorneys.com; Additional Info: Private Attorney: REMER , JASON S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Becerra, Roymel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X1; Additional Info: Defendant: Elite Gunite LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Becerra, Roymel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Becerra, Roymel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Becerra, Roymel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Becerra, Roymel

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer THOMPSON , LAURIE A