This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 09/18/2021 at 11:05:35 (UTC).

Beacon Sales Acquisition Inc vs TB Roofing & Construction LLc

Case Summary

On 05/27/2021 Beacon Sales Acquisition Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against TB Roofing Construction LLc. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Tesche Arkin, Caroline. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4415

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Tesche Arkin, Caroline

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Beacon Sales Acquisition Inc

505 Huntmar Park Drive Suite 300

Herndon, VA 20170

Defendants

Sziranko, Lincoln

Largo, FL 33774

TB Roofing & Construction LLc

13801 Walsingham Road #135

Largo, FL 33774

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEUNG , BRIAN ANDREW

Attorney at HOLCOMB & LEUNG, P.A.

3203 W Cypress St

Tampa, FL 33607-5109

Defendant Attorney

TILTON , ANTHONY DAVID

Attorney at AUSLEY & MCMULLEN, P.A.

Po Box 391

Tallahassee, FL 32302

 

Court Documents

RESPONSE

08/10/2021: RESPONSE

AMENDED ANSWER

08/02/2021: AMENDED ANSWER

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

07/26/2021: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF HEARING

07/14/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING

MOTION TO STRIKE

07/14/2021: MOTION TO STRIKE

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

06/29/2021: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

05/28/2021: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

05/28/2021: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

05/28/2021: General Differentiated Case Management Order

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/27/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

05/27/2021: COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

05/27/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/27/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/27/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2021
  • HearingDifferentiated Case Management; Hearing Time: 11:30 AM; Hearing Location: WEBEX NUMBER 813-272-5801 ENTER ACCESS CODE: 994-670-953 Judicial Officer: Tesche Arkin, Caroline

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Defendant: Sziranko, Lincoln; Defendant: TB Roofing & Construction LLc; Private Attorney: TILTON , ANTHONY DAVID

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketORDER DENYING MOTION; Comment: TO DISMISS; Additional Info: Defendant: Sziranko, Lincoln; Defendant: TB Roofing & Construction LLc; Plaintiff: Beacon Sales Acquisition Inc; Private Attorney: LEUNG , BRIAN ANDREW; Private Attorney: TILTON , ANTHONY DAVID; Date 2: 08/30/2021; Judicial Officer: Tesche Arkin, Caroline

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketMEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Beacon Sales Acquisition Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Beacon Sales Acquisition Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED ANSWER; Additional Info: Defendant: Sziranko, Lincoln; Defendant: TB Roofing & Construction LLc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Beacon Sales Acquisition Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO STRIKE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Beacon Sales Acquisition Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Comment: Motion to Dismiss 8/30/2021 @9:45AM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Beacon Sales Acquisition Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: Sziranko, Lincoln; Defendant: TB Roofing & Construction LLc

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X2; Additional Info: Defendant: Sziranko, Lincoln; Defendant: TB Roofing & Construction LLc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Beacon Sales Acquisition Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Beacon Sales Acquisition Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Beacon Sales Acquisition Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Beacon Sales Acquisition Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Beacon Sales Acquisition Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TB Roofing & Construction LLc is a litigant

Latest cases where Beacon Sales Acquisition, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TILTON ESQ, ANTHONY D