This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 10/22/2019 at 09:38:32 (UTC).

BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC vs Thomas, Bonnie Marie

Case Summary

On 01/25/2019 BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Thomas, Bonnie Marie. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Cook, J.. Martha. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0940

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Cook, J.. Martha

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC

2424 North Federal Highway Ste 360

Boca Raton, FL 33431

Defendants

American Express National Bank

4315 South 2700 West

Salt Lake City, UT 84184

Thomas, Eric Scott

Riverview, FL 33578

UNKNOWN HEIRS OF ERNEST F THOMAS IV AKA ERNEST F THOMAS

Unknown Spouse of Bonnie Marie Thomas

Riverview, FL 33578

Unknown Spouse of Eric Scott Thomas

Riverview, FL 33578

South Pointe of Tampa Homeowners Association Inc

400 North Ashley Drive, Ste. 2020

Tampa, FL 33602

Unknown Parties in Possession 2

Riverview, FL 33578

Unknown Parties in Possession 1

Riverview, FL 33578

Thomas, Bonnie Marie

Riverview, FL 33578

Guardian Ad Litem

KARYO , MAX RAFAEL

Boca Raton, FL 33431

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SKALA , HELEN M, Esquire

Attorney at SHAPIRO, FISHMAN & GACHE, LLP

4630 Woodland Corporate Blvd Ste 100

Tampa, FL 33614-2429

SKALA , HELEN MARIE

4900 Memorial Hwy Fl 4

Tampa, FL 33634

Defendant Attorneys

KARYO , MAX RAFAEL

Attorney at THE KARYO LAW FIRM P A

3200 N Federal Hwy Ste 222

Boca Raton, FL 33431

GLAUSIER , CHARLES EVANS, Esquire

Attorney at GLAUSIER KNIGHT, PLLC

400 N Ashley Dr Ste 2020

Tampa, FL 33602-4311

GLAUSIER , CHARLES EVANS

Attorney at GLAUSIER KNIGHT JONES, PLLC

400 N Ashley Dr Ste 2020

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

02/14/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

02/14/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

LIS PENDENS (RECORDABLE)

01/28/2019: LIS PENDENS (RECORDABLE)

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

01/28/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

LIS PENDENS

01/25/2019: LIS PENDENS

NOTICE OF FILING

01/25/2019: NOTICE OF FILING

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

01/25/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

01/25/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

01/25/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

02/14/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

02/14/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

01/28/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

01/28/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

COMPLAINT

01/25/2019: COMPLAINT

LIS PENDENS

01/25/2019: LIS PENDENS

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

01/25/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

01/25/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

01/25/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2019
  • REPORT; Comment: GUARDIAN AD LITEM S SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT TO COURT; Additional Info: Guardian Ad Litem: KARYO , MAX RAFAEL; Private Attorney: KARYO , MAX RAFAEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2019
  • REPORT; Additional Info: Guardian Ad Litem: KARYO , MAX RAFAEL; Private Attorney: KARYO , MAX RAFAEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2019
  • ANSWER; Additional Info: Guardian Ad Litem: KARYO , MAX RAFAEL; Private Attorney: KARYO , MAX RAFAEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY; Additional Info: Defendant: Thomas, Bonnie Marie

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • BANKRUPTCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2019
  • ACCEPTANCE; Comment: OF APPOINTMENT AS GUARDIAN AD LITEM AND MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING ON BEHALF OF DEFTS; Additional Info: Defendant: UNKNOWN HEIRS OF ERNEST F THOMAS IV AKA ERNEST F THOMAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY; Additional Info: Plaintiff: BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM; Comment: MAX KARYO, ESQ., IS HEREBY APPOINTED ATTORNEY/GUARDIAN AD LITEM 03/06/19 MJC; Additional Info: Defendant: Thomas, Bonnie Marie; Defendant: Thomas, Eric Scott; Defendant: UNKNOWN HEIRS OF ERNEST F THOMAS IV AKA ERNEST F THOMAS; Date Signed: 03/06/2019; Judicial Officer: Cook, Martha J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • NOTICE; Comment: OF ACTION - We have accepted the Certificate of Title, Certificate of Sale or Certificate of Disbursement through the E-Portal. These certificates and the Proposed Uniform Final Judgment of Foreclosur; Additional Info: Plaintiff: BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • MOTION TO APPOINT GUARDIAN AD LITEM; Comment: OF; Additional Info: Plaintiff: BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 01/25/2019
  • NOTICE OF FILING; Comment: CERTIFICATION OF POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL NOTE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • Judgment Code: BANK; Judgment Description: BANKRUPTCY; Judge: Cook, Martha J.

    Read MoreRead Less