This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 09/10/2022 at 07:02:32 (UTC).

Bayfront Hma Medical Center Llc vs Hamilton, Joel

Case Summary

On 06/02/2022 Bayfront Hma Medical Center Llc filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Hamilton, Joel. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Tompkins, Joseph M, Tompkins, M. Joseph and Tompkins, Joseph. M. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7244

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Tompkins, Joseph M

Tompkins, M. Joseph

Tompkins, Joseph. M

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BAYFRONT HEALTH ST PETERSBURG

Bayfront Hma Medical Center Llc

1980 Michigan Avenue

Cocoa, FL 32922

Defendant

Hamilton, Joel

Tampa, FL 33629

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOTANE , TROY R

Attorney at LOTANE & ASSOCIATES, P.A.

1980 Michigan Ave

Cocoa, FL 32922-5729

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

06/02/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

06/02/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/02/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

06/03/2022: E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

07/21/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

07/21/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

07/21/2022: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2022
  • HearingPRETRIAL; Cancelled Comments: Voluntary Dismissal of Cause; Hearing Time: 09:30 AM; Hearing Location: HTTPS://ZOOM.US/J/9580902034 MEETING ID: 958 090 2034PASSWORD: NOT REQUIRED Judicial Officer: Tompkins, Joseph M

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2022363183; Judge: Tompkins, Joseph M

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bayfront Hma Medical Center Llc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED; Comment: JOEL HAMILTON; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bayfront Hma Medical Center Llc; Plaintiff Doing Business As: BAYFRONT HEALTH ST PETERSBURG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED; Comment: JOEL HAMILTON; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bayfront Hma Medical Center Llc; Plaintiff Doing Business As: BAYFRONT HEALTH ST PETERSBURG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET; Additional Info: Defendant: Hamilton, Joel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bayfront Hma Medical Center Llc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bayfront Hma Medical Center Llc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bayfront Hma Medical Center Llc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bayfront Hma Medical Center Llc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BAYFRONT HEALTH ST PETERSBURG is a litigant

Latest cases where BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER LLC DOING BUSINESS AS BAYFRONT HEALTH ST PETERSBURG is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lotane, Troy R