This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 06/27/2022 at 10:16:19 (UTC).

Bayfront Hma Medical Center Llc vs Brazelton, Jonathan

Case Summary

On 03/14/2022 Bayfront Hma Medical Center Llc filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Brazelton, Jonathan. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Lopez, S. Susan, Lopez, Susan. S and Lopez, Susan S. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6619

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Lopez, S. Susan

Lopez, Susan. S

Lopez, Susan S

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BAYFRONT HEALTH ST PETERSBURG

Bayfront Hma Medical Center Llc

1980 Michigan Avenue

Cocoa, FL 32922

Defendant

Brazelton, Jonathan

Tampa, FL 33605

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOTANE , TROY R

Attorney at LOTANE & ASSOCIATES, P.A.

1980 Michigan Ave

Cocoa, FL 32922-5729

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

03/14/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

03/14/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

03/14/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

03/15/2022: E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

03/27/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

03/14/2022: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

04/21/2022: DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

COURT TICKET

04/21/2022: COURT TICKET

AFFIDAVIT

05/04/2022: AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT AS TO INDEBTEDNESS

05/04/2022: AFFIDAVIT AS TO INDEBTEDNESS

AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS

05/04/2022: AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

06/22/2022: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bayfront Hma Medical Center Llc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • JudgementJudgment Code: FJ; Judgment Description: FINAL JUDGMENT; Instrument Number: 2022244339; Judge: Lopez, Susan S

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bayfront Hma Medical Center Llc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AS TO INDEBTEDNESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bayfront Hma Medical Center Llc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bayfront Hma Medical Center Llc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • HearingPRETRIAL; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602; Judicial Officer: Lopez, Susan S

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT TICKET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK; Comment: AT PRETRIAL; Additional Info: Defendant: Brazelton, Jonathan; Plaintiff: Bayfront Hma Medical Center Llc; Plaintiff Doing Business As: BAYFRONT HEALTH ST PETERSBURG; Private Attorney: LOTANE , TROY R

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: Jonathan Brazelton, 3/26/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET; Additional Info: Defendant: Brazelton, Jonathan

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bayfront Hma Medical Center Llc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bayfront Hma Medical Center Llc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bayfront Hma Medical Center Llc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bayfront Hma Medical Center Llc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BAYFRONT HEALTH ST PETERSBURG is a litigant

Latest cases where BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER LLC DOING BUSINESS AS BAYFRONT HEALTH ST PETERSBURG is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lotane, Troy R