This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 07/10/2022 at 20:38:06 (UTC).

Bava, Christopher vs UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

Case Summary

On 06/16/2022 Bava, Christopher filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Gabbard, X. Jennifer, Gabbard, Jennifer. X and Gabbard, Jennifer X. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5092

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Gabbard, X. Jennifer

Gabbard, Jennifer. X

Gabbard, Jennifer X

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bava, Christopher

Tampa, FL 33611

Defendants

Fernandez, Damaris

Tampa, FL 33607

Portier, LLC

Registered Agent / Ct Corporation System 1200 S. Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

Rasier (FL), LLC

Registered Agent / Ct Corporation System 1200 S. Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

Registered Agent / Ct Corporation System 1200 S. Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TRICHLER , ERNIE E., II

Attorney at MANDELBAUM TRICHLER LAW CENTER P A

6528 Gunn Hwy

Tampa, FL 33625

 

Court Documents

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

06/16/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

06/16/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

06/16/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

06/16/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

06/16/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

COMPLAINT

06/16/2022: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/16/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

06/17/2022: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

06/17/2022: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

06/17/2022: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

06/17/2022: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

06/17/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED

06/27/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED

06/27/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED

06/27/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2023
  • HearingDifferentiated Case Management; Hearing Time: 03:00 PM; Hearing Location: HTTPS://ZOOM.US/J/94004094230 MEETING ID 940 0409 4230 Judicial Officer: Gabbard, Jennifer X

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED; Comment: 06/24/2022 DEFT UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC AND NOTICE OF FILING ATTCHD; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bava, Christopher

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED; Comment: 06/24/2022 DEFT PORTIER, LLC RA AND NOTICE OF FILING ATTCHD; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bava, Christopher

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED; Comment: 06/24/2022 DEFT RASIER, LLC AND NOTICE OF FILING ATTCHD; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bava, Christopher

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X4; Additional Info: Defendant: Fernandez, Damaris; Defendant: Portier, LLC; Defendant: Rasier (FL), LLC; Defendant: UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bava, Christopher

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bava, Christopher

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bava, Christopher

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bava, Christopher

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bava, Christopher

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bava, Christopher

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bava, Christopher

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTIER, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where RASIER LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where UBER TECHNOLOGIES INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TRICHLER , ERNIE E., II