Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 04/09/2021 at 14:38:30 (UTC).

BASS, STANLEY S - Estate

Case Summary

On 03/10/2020 BASS, STANLEY S - Estate was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Corvo, T. Vivian and Corvo, Vivian. T. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0760

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Corvo, T. Vivian

Corvo, Vivian. T

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court, Petitioners and Trustees

Edelman, Howard A

Tampa, FL 33602

LOCOLA, ARLENE G

Oradell, NJ 07649

Liebman, Judith

Hackensack, NJ 07601

STANLEY S BAS REVOCABLE TRUST, DATED

EDELMAN, DEAN P

Lake Mary, FL 32746

BASS, ANDREA D

San Francisco, CA 94118

ESTATE OF DOUGLAS H BASS

55 E 9Th St Apt 8K

New York, NY 10003

THE SUNCOAST HAVEN OF REST RESCUE MISSION

1763 9Th Ave N

St Petersburg, FL 33713

STANLEY S BASS REVOCABLE TRUST, DATED

BASS, JONATHAN D

New York, NY 10022

Claimants

BROOKDALE SENIOR LIVING

Milwaukee, WI 53214

INPHYNET CONTRACTING SRV, LLC

C/O Dcm Services 7601 Penn Ave S Suite A600

Minneapolis, MN 55423-5004

Decedent

BASS, STANLEY S

Tampa, FL 33602

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court, Petitioner and Trustee Attorneys

ROBERTS , NATALIE ANNE

Attorney at FLAGSHIP LAW, PLLC

2309 S Macdill Ave

Tampa, FL 33629

BELLEW , BRANDON D

Attorney at JOHNSON, POPE, BOKOR, RUPPEL & BURNS

911 Chestnut St

Clearwater, FL 33756

FLEECE , JOSEPH W, III

Attorney at LEGACY PROTECTION LAWYERS, LLP

100 2Nd Ave S Ste 900

St Petersburg, FL 33701

BLACKBURN , CATHERINE ELAINE

Attorney at BLACKBURN LAW FIRM, PLLC

5230 Central Ave

St Petersburg, FL 33707

KIRSCH, LAURA S

Attorney at KIRSCH & KIRSCH LLP

2 University Plaza

Hackensack, NJ 07601

KIRSCH, DANIEL E

Attorney at KIRSCH && KIRSCH LLP

2 University Plaza

Hackensack, NJ 07601

WEIDNER , MATTHEW DECELL

Attorney at MATTHEW D. WEIDNER, PA

250 Mirror Lake Dr N

St Petersburg, FL 33701

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Beneficiary: THE SUNCOAST HAVEN OF REST RESCUE MISSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketORD EXT FILING OF INVENTORY; Comment: UNTIL 6/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketPET TO EXT FILING INVENTORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketRESPONSE; Comment: TO PETITIONER'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Private Attorney: BELLEW , BRANDON D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketRESPONSE; Comment: TO DEFT'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketCOPY OF; Comment: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Beneficiary: LOCOLA, ARLENE G; Petitioner: LOCOLA, ARLENE G; Trustee: LOCOLA, ARLENE G

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketNOTICE; Comment: OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketRESPONSE; Comment: TO DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Comment: TO PETITIONER, JUDITH LIEBMAN; Additional Info: Beneficiary: EDELMAN, HOWARD A; Personal Representative: EDELMAN, HOWARD A; Petitioner: EDELMAN, HOWARD A; Private Attorney: BELLEW , BRANDON D; Trustee: EDELMAN, HOWARD A

    Read MoreRead Less
64 More Docket Entries
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketPROBATE NEW CASE FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketPET FOR ADMIN-FLA RES W-WILL; Additional Info: Beneficiary: EDELMAN, HOWARD A; Personal Representative: EDELMAN, HOWARD A; Petitioner: EDELMAN, HOWARD A; Trustee: EDELMAN, HOWARD A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO RULE 2-420; Additional Info: Beneficiary: EDELMAN, HOWARD A; Personal Representative: EDELMAN, HOWARD A; Petitioner: EDELMAN, HOWARD A; Trustee: EDELMAN, HOWARD A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE FILED; Comment: EFILED; Additional Info: Beneficiary: EDELMAN, HOWARD A; Personal Representative: EDELMAN, HOWARD A; Petitioner: EDELMAN, HOWARD A; Trustee: EDELMAN, HOWARD A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Beneficiary: EDELMAN, HOWARD A; Personal Representative: EDELMAN, HOWARD A; Petitioner: EDELMAN, HOWARD A; Trustee: EDELMAN, HOWARD A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketCOPY OF; Comment: NOTICE OF PROBATE PROCEEDINGS TO TRUSTEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE FILED; Comment: ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketOATH, DESIGNATION & ACCEPTANCE; Additional Info: Beneficiary: EDELMAN, HOWARD A; Personal Representative: EDELMAN, HOWARD A; Petitioner: EDELMAN, HOWARD A; Trustee: EDELMAN, HOWARD A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE; Comment: JONI J MANN DATED 3/10/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE; Comment: JONI J MANN DATED 3/10/20

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INPHYNET CONTRACTING SRV LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FLEECE , JOSEPH W, III

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BELLEW , BRANDON D