This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 06/19/2022 at 06:29:32 (UTC).

Bartlett, Delorah vs A.O. Smith Corporation

Case Summary

On 05/13/2022 Bartlett, Delorah filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against A O Smith Corporation. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Farfante, D. Darren, Farfante, Darren D and Farfante, Darren. D. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4001

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Farfante, D. Darren

Farfante, Darren D

Farfante, Darren. D

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bartlett, Delorah

Wimauma, FL 33598

Defendants

A.O. Smith Corporation

1201 Hays Street Suite 105

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Arvinmeritor Inc.

1200 South Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

ASTEC, INC.

605 Chestnut Street Suite 1700

Chattanooga, TN 37450

BRIDGESTONE AMERICAS TIRE OPERATIONS, LLC

801 Us Highway 1

North Palm Beach, FL 33408

CARLISLE INDUSTRIAL BRAKE & FRICTION INC.

3411 Silverside Road Tatnall Building #104

Wilmington, DE 19810

CARRIER CORPORATION

801 Us Highway 1

North Palm Beach, FL 33408

CATERPILLAR GLOBAL MINING, LLC

1201 Hays Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301

CATERPILLAR INC.

1201 Hays Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301

CLARK-RELIANCE CORPORATION

4400 Easton Commons Way

Columbus, OH 43219

CLEAVER-BROOKS INC.

251 Little Falls Drive

Wilmington, DE 19808

CUMMINS INC.

1201 Hays Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301

DCO LLC

165 Myrtle Brook Bend

Ponte Vedra, FL 32081

DEMAG CRANES & COMPONENTS CORP.

4400 Easton Commons Way Suite 125

Columbus, OH 43219

DOVER CORPORATION

801 Adlai Stevenson Drive

Springfield, IL 62703

FLOWSERVE CORPORATION

28 Liberty Street

New York, NY 10005

FLOWSERVE US, INC.

1200 South Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

FMC CORPORATION

1200 S. Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION

801 Us Highway 1

North Palm Beach, FL 33408

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

1200 S. Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

20 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THOMAS, ALEXIS BROOKE

Attorney at VINSON LAW P.A.

5505 W Gray St

Tampa, FL 33609-1007

Defendant Attorneys

CLARK , TIMOTHY

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF TIMOTHY CLARK, P.A.

915 Middle River Dr Ste 513

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33304

MEDINA , EDUARDO J

Attorney at FOLEY & MANSFIELD PLLP

4770 Biscayne Blvd Ste 1000

Miami, FL 33137-3232

FERGUSON , TIMOTHY JOHN

Attorney at FOLEY MANSFIELD PLLP

4770 Biscayne Blvd Ste 1000

Miami, FL 33137

CACHALDORA , AMANDA RAE

Attorney at BICE COLE LAW FIRM, PL

999 Ponce De Leon Blvd Ste 710

Coral Gables, FL 33134

COHEN , STUART LANCE

Attorney at LUKS, SANTANIELLO, PETRILLO, & COHEN

150 W Flagler St Ste 2600

Miami, FL 33130

COLLINGS , CHRISTOPHER JAMES MORE

Attorney at COLLINGS LAW FIRM

255 Alhambra Cir Ste 800

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Other Attorneys

NUZUM , JANNA MARIE

Attorney at THE COOK GROUP

4737 N Ocean Dr Ste 208

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33308

HORN , HANSON DOUGLAS

Attorney at THE COOK GROUP

115 Broadway Rm 1602

New York, NY 10006

WEINSTEIN , STUART AARON

Attorney at SHAPIRO, BLASI, WASSERMAN & HERMANN, P.A.

7777 Glades Rd Ste 400

Boca Raton, FL 33434

BRISCOE , EDWARD J

Attorney at FOWLER WHITE BURNETT P A

1395 Brickell Ave Ste 14

Miami, FL 33131

RUBENSTEIN , BRIAN DAVID

Attorney at COLE, SCOTT & KISSANE, P.A.

4301 W Boy Scout Blvd Ste 400

Tampa, FL 33607

PAZOS , LUCIA VERONICA

Attorney at MANNING GROSS + MASSENBURG LLP

701 Brickell Ave Ste 2000

Miami, FL 33131

MCCUTCHEON , CAITLYN R.

Attorney at MORGAN, LEWIS & BOCKIUS, LLP

600 Brickell Ave Ste 1600

Miami, FL 33131

 

Court Documents

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

06/17/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

06/17/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

06/16/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF JOINDER

06/16/2022: NOTICE OF JOINDER

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

06/16/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

MOTION TO DISMISS

06/16/2022: MOTION TO DISMISS

MOTION TO DISMISS

06/15/2022: MOTION TO DISMISS

MOTION TO DISMISS

06/15/2022: MOTION TO DISMISS

MOTION TO DISMISS

06/15/2022: MOTION TO DISMISS

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/13/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/13/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/13/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/13/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/13/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/13/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/13/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/13/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/13/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

121 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2023
  • HearingDifferentiated Case Management; Hearing Time: 09:30 AM; Hearing Location: JOIN COURT ZOOM MEETING HTTPS://ZOOM.US/J/4205308406 MEETING ID 420 530 8406 SMART PHONE USE "ONE TAP MOBILE"FEATURE AT THE FOLLOWING NUMBER 17866351003 Judicial Officer: Farfante, Darren D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: DOVER CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: BRIDGESTONE AMERICAS TIRE OPERATIONS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: MANITOWOC COMPANY, INC. (THE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF JOINDER; Comment: BY DEFENDANTS DOVER CORPORATION, SAINT-GOBAIN ABRASIVES, INC., AND INDUSTRIAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION IN MOTIONS TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF S COMPLAINT OF VARIOUS DEFENDANTS; Additional Info: Defendant: SAINT-GOBAIN ABRASIVES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: CUMMINS INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS; Additional Info: Defendant: CUMMINS INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Private Attorney: MEDINA , EDUARDO J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS; Comment: PLTFF'S COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Private Attorney: MEDINA , EDUARDO J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Private Attorney: MEDINA , EDUARDO J

    Read MoreRead Less
117 More Docket Entries
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bartlett, Delorah

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bartlett, Delorah

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bartlett, Delorah

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bartlett, Delorah

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bartlett, Delorah

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bartlett, Delorah

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bartlett, Delorah

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bartlett, Delorah

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bartlett, Delorah

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bartlett, Delorah

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ASTEC,Ltd d/b/a Sprouts Extraordinaire, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CATERPILLAR GLOBAL MINING AMERICA, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where DOVER CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where CLARK-RELIANCE CORPORATION is a litigant