This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 09/08/2021 at 05:22:34 (UTC).

NILL, BARBARA vs Ortiz, Daniel

Case Summary

On 06/10/2021 NILL, BARBARA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Ortiz, Daniel. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Nash, C.. Christopher, Nash, Christopher. C. and Nash, Christopher C.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4774

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Nash, C.. Christopher

Nash, Christopher. C.

Nash, Christopher C.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Barbara Nill, Jeff Nill, And Jamie Nill

Tampa, FL 33606

NILL, BARBARA

Tampa, FL 33606

NILL, JAMIE

NILL, JEFF

Defendants

Castellana, Marcelino

Riverview, FL 33578

Chief Financial Officer For Allstate Fire And Casualty Ins

200 East Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Chief Financial Officer For Geico General Ins Co,

200 East Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Ct Corporation System, For Rasier(Fl),Llc

1200 S Pine Island

Plantation, FL 33324

Ct Corporation System, For Rasier-Dc, Llc

1200 S Pine Island

Plantation, FL 33324

Ct Corporation System, For Uber Technolog,

1200 S Pine Island

Plantation, FL 33324

Ortiz, Daniel

Ruskin, FL 33570

Ortiz, Noe

Ruskin, FL 33570

ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

200 East Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

200 East Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

RASIER (FL), LLC

1200 S Pine Island

Plantation, FL 33324

RASIER-DC, LLC

1200 S Pine Island

Plantation, FL 33324

UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC

1200 S Pine Island

Plantation, FL 33324

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LIMBEROPOULOS , CHRIS MATTHEW

Attorney at THE FLORIDA LAW GROUP

407 N Howard Ave Ste 100

Tampa, FL 33606

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

07/09/2021: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

07/09/2021: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

COMPLAINT

06/10/2021: COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

06/10/2021: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

06/11/2021: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

06/11/2021: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

06/11/2021: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

06/11/2021: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

06/11/2021: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

06/11/2021: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

06/11/2021: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

06/11/2021: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

06/11/2021: General Differentiated Case Management Order

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/10/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

06/10/2021: COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

06/10/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2021
  • HearingDifferentiated Case Management; Hearing Time: 01:00 PM; Hearing Location: VIRTUAL COURT DATE - HTTPS://ZOOM.US/J/4812642204 MEETING ID: 481 264 2204 Judicial Officer: Nash, Christopher C.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Defendant: Ortiz, Daniel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Defendant: Ortiz, Daniel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: NILL, BARBARA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: NILL, BARBARA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2021347412; Judge: Nash, Christopher C.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X8; Additional Info: Defendant: ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY; Defendant: Castellana, Marcelino; Defendant: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY; Defendant: Ortiz, Daniel; Defendant: Ortiz, Noe; Defendant: RASIER (FL), LLC; Defendant: RASIER-DC, LLC; Defendant: UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X8

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: NILL, BARBARA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: NILL, BARBARA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: NILL, BARBARA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: NILL, BARBARA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: NILL, BARBARA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: NILL, BARBARA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: NILL, BARBARA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: NILL, BARBARA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: NILL, BARBARA

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CT CORPORATION SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases where RASIER-DC LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where RASIER LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where UBER TECHNOLOGIES INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant