Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 05/22/2021 at 08:02:23 (UTC).

Bank Of America NA vs Kafcas, Jay R

Case Summary

On 04/06/2021 Bank Of America NA filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Kafcas, Jay R. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Ober, Ann. Joelle, Ober, Joelle. Ann and Ober, Joelle Ann. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2999

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Ober, Ann. Joelle

Ober, Joelle. Ann

Ober, Joelle Ann

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bank Of America NA

887 Donald Ross Road

Juno Beach, FL 33408

Defendant

Kafcas, Jay R

Lutz, FL 33549

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PALMA , JORGE LUIS

Attorney at ANDREU, PALMA, LAVIN & SOLIS, PLLC

815 Nw 57Th Ave Ste 401

Miami, FL 33126

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

04/20/2021: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

04/09/2021: E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/06/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

04/06/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

04/06/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2021
  • HearingPRETRIAL; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 301 3RD FL 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602; Judicial Officer: Ober, Joelle Ann

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: 04-19-21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET; Additional Info: Defendant: Kafcas, Jay R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bank Of America NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bank Of America NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bank Of America NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bank Of America NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO RULE 2-420; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bank Of America NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bank Of America NA

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Palma, Jorge L, ESQ.