This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 10/19/2021 at 17:45:52 (UTC).

Bank Of America NA vs Imonti, Leona A

Case Summary

On 09/07/2021 Bank Of America NA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Imonti, Leona A. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Ober, Joelle. Ann and Ober, Ann. Joelle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3653

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Ober, Joelle. Ann

Ober, Ann. Joelle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bank Of America NA

7901 Sw 6Th Court, Suite 310

Plantation, FL 33331

Defendant

Imonti, Leona A

Sun City Center, FL 33573-6905

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SZYMANSKI , MATEUSZ MARCIN

Attorney at COOLING & WINTER, LLC

7901 Sw 6Th Ct Ste 310

Plantation, FL 33324

Defendant Attorney

POE , CODY SHEA

Attorney at MR. CODY SHEA POE

2401 Nw 23Rd St Ste 42

Oklahoma City, OK 73107

 

Court Documents

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

09/08/2021: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

09/08/2021: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

09/07/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/07/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

09/07/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

09/07/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Imonti, Leona A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketANSWER; Comment: TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Defendant: Imonti, Leona A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: LEONA A IMONTI 9/25/2021 Substitute

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Imonti, Leona A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bank Of America NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bank Of America NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bank Of America NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bank Of America NA

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer POE CODY S