This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 08/05/2022 at 01:07:11 (UTC).

Bank Of America, N.a. vs Hamby, William G

Case Summary

On 06/17/2022 Bank Of America, N a filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Hamby, William G. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Tompkins, M. Joseph, Tompkins, Joseph. M and Tompkins, Joseph M. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2050

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Tompkins, M. Joseph

Tompkins, Joseph. M

Tompkins, Joseph M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bank Of America, N.a.

7765 Sw 87Th Ave #101

Miami, FL 33173

Defendant

Hamby, William G

Tampa, FL 33635-6279

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DRAGUTSKY , JASON SCOTT

Attorney at HAYT HAYT & LANDAU, PL

7765 Sw 87Th Ave Ste 101

Miami, FL 33173

 

Court Documents

E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

06/17/2022: E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

06/17/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

06/17/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/17/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

06/24/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

07/20/2022: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2022
  • HearingPRETRIAL; Cancelled Comments: Voluntary Dismissal of Cause; Hearing Time: 09:30 AM; Hearing Location: HTTPS://ZOOM.US/J/9580902034 MEETING ID: 958 090 2034PASSWORD: NOT REQUIRED Judicial Officer: Tompkins, Joseph M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2022361809; Judge: Tompkins, Joseph M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bank Of America, N.a.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: WILLIAM G HAMBY, 6/23/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bank Of America, N.a.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bank Of America, N.a.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bank Of America, N.a.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bank Of America, N.a.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET; Additional Info: Defendant: Hamby, William G

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JASON DRAGUTSKY