Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 04/15/2021 at 08:34:37 (UTC).

Bank Of America, N.a. vs Gonzalez, Adilson

Case Summary

On 02/21/2021 Bank Of America, N a filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Gonzalez, Adilson. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Criminal Court Annex located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Valkenburg, V.. Miriam, Valkenburg, Miriam. V. and Valkenburg, Miriam V.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6988

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Criminal Court Annex

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Valkenburg, V.. Miriam

Valkenburg, Miriam. V.

Valkenburg, Miriam V.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bank Of America, N.a.

7765 Sw 87Th Ave

Miami, FL 33173

Defendant

Gonzalez, Adilson

Tampa, FL 33647-3200

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OROVITZ , ROBERT JAY

Attorney at HAYT, HAYT & LANDAU, PL

7765 Sw 87Th Ave Ste 101

Miami, FL 33173

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

03/11/2021: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

03/01/2021: E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/21/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

02/21/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2021
  • HearingPRETRIAL; Hearing Time: 09:30 AM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 305 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602; Judicial Officer: Valkenburg, Miriam V.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: 03/10/2021 DEFT. ADILSON GONZALEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET; Additional Info: Defendant: Gonzalez, Adilson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketNO SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: (AWAITING ON PRETRIAL DATES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bank Of America, N.a.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bank Of America, N.a.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bank Of America, N.a.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bank Of America, N.a.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer OROVITZ , ROBERT J