This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 08/08/2022 at 03:03:09 (UTC).

Bank Of America, N.a. vs Fontecha, July Andrea

Case Summary

On 06/17/2022 Bank Of America, N a filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Fontecha, July Andrea. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Giardina, S. James, Giardina, James S and Giardina, James. S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2048

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Giardina, S. James

Giardina, James. S

Giardina, James S

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bank Of America, N.a.

7765 Sw 87Th Ave #101

Miami, FL 33173

Defendant

Fontecha, July Andrea

Tampa, FL 33614-4201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DRAGUTSKY , JASON SCOTT

Attorney at HAYT HAYT & LANDAU, PL

7765 Sw 87Th Ave Ste 101

Miami, FL 33173

Defendant Attorney

CASTELLANOS , J NICHOLAS

Attorney at HOLLAND LAW GROUP

1401 Manatee Ave W Ste 1010

Bradenton, FL 34205

 

Court Documents

E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

06/17/2022: E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

06/17/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

06/17/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/17/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

06/17/2022: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

06/23/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

08/02/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2022
  • HearingPRETRIAL; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Hearing Location: HTTPS://ZOOM.US/J/97219657408 ZOOM MEETING ID IS 972-1965-7408PASSWORD IS 031612 Judicial Officer: Giardina, James S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Fontecha, July Andrea

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: DEFT: JULY ANDREA FONTECHA- 6/22/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bank Of America, N.a.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bank Of America, N.a.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bank Of America, N.a.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bank Of America, N.a.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET; Additional Info: Defendant: Fontecha, July Andrea

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant