This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 07/11/2022 at 04:03:48 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. vs DAVIS, VERA

Case Summary

On 06/23/2021 BANK OF AMERICA, N A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DAVIS, VERA. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Criminal Court Annex located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Allen, A. Lisa, Allen, Lisa. A, Allen, Lisa A and Valkenburg, V.. Miriam. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0681

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Allen, A. Lisa

Allen, Lisa. A

Allen, Lisa A

Valkenburg, V.. Miriam

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

P.O. Box 982238

El Paso, TX 79998-2238

Defendant

DAVIS, VERA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

POPE , MONIQUE KRISTINE

Attorney at ANDREU, PALMA, LAVIN & SOLIS, PLLC

4570 N Jefferson Ave

Miami, FL 33140

 

Court Documents

TRANSMITTAL LETTER

06/24/2021: TRANSMITTAL LETTER

CERTIFIED COPY OF

06/23/2021: CERTIFIED COPY OF

CERTIFIED COPY OF

06/23/2021: CERTIFIED COPY OF

Event To Hold All Other Pleadings

06/24/2021: Event To Hold All Other Pleadings

Event To Hold All Other Pleadings

06/24/2021: Event To Hold All Other Pleadings

Event To Hold All Other Pleadings

06/24/2021: Event To Hold All Other Pleadings

Event To Hold All Other Pleadings

06/24/2021: Event To Hold All Other Pleadings

Event To Hold All Other Pleadings

06/24/2021: Event To Hold All Other Pleadings

Event To Hold All Other Pleadings

06/24/2021: Event To Hold All Other Pleadings

Event To Hold All Other Pleadings

06/24/2021: Event To Hold All Other Pleadings

Event To Hold All Other Pleadings

06/24/2021: Event To Hold All Other Pleadings

Event To Hold All Other Pleadings

06/24/2021: Event To Hold All Other Pleadings

Event To Hold All Other Pleadings

06/24/2021: Event To Hold All Other Pleadings

Event To Hold All Other Pleadings

06/24/2021: Event To Hold All Other Pleadings

COPY OF

06/24/2021: COPY OF

NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION

02/02/2022: NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION

RETURNED MAIL

05/02/2022: RETURNED MAIL

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • HearingDismissal Docket - Small Claim; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 305 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602; Judicial Officer: Allen, Lisa A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • JudgementJudgment Code: ODLPAH; Judgment Description: ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION AFTER HEARING; Instrument Number: 2022211030; Judge: Allen, Lisa A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION AFTER HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION; Comment: SMALL CLAIMS DISMISSAL NOTICE; Additional Info: Private Attorney: POPE, MONIQUE KRISTINE; Date 2: 04/21/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF; Comment: RECEIPT FOR FILE MAILED BACK TO PINELLAS COUNT CLERK OF COURT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent To Hold All Other Pleadings; Comment: From the Pinellas County Court Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent To Hold All Other Pleadings; Comment: From the Pinellas County Court Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent To Hold All Other Pleadings; Comment: From the Pinellas County Court Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent To Hold All Other Pleadings; Comment: From the Pinellas County Court Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent To Hold All Other Pleadings; Comment: From the Pinellas County Court Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent To Hold All Other Pleadings; Comment: From the Pinellas County Court Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent To Hold All Other Pleadings; Comment: From the Pinellas County Court Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent To Hold All Other Pleadings; Comment: From the Pinellas County Court Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent To Hold All Other Pleadings; Comment: From the Pinellas County Court Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSMITTAL LETTER; Additional Info: Private Attorney: POPE, MONIQUE KRISTINE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Comment: (Transferred Case)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY OF; Comment: ORDER GRANTING PLTF'S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY OF; Comment: PINELLAS COUNTY COURT CASE DOCKET SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer POPE , MONIQUE K