Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 04/10/2021 at 07:32:40 (UTC).

Bank Of America, N.A. vs Coker, Rebecca L

Case Summary

On 02/21/2021 Bank Of America, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Coker, Rebecca L. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Moody, James. S and Moody, S. James. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6984

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Moody, James. S

Moody, S. James

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bank Of America, N.a.

7765 Sw 87Th Ave

Miami, FL 33173

Defendant

Coker, Rebecca L

Tampa, FL 33624-3054

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OROVITZ , ROBERT JAY

Attorney at HAYT, HAYT & LANDAU, PL

7765 Sw 87Th Ave Ste 101

Miami, FL 33173

Defendant Attorney

HICKS , DAVID CANDLER

Attorney at HOLLAND LAW GROUP

3639 Cortez Rd W Ste 130

Bradenton, FL 34210

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

03/14/2021: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

02/23/2021: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

COMPLAINT

02/21/2021: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/21/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

02/21/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Additional Info: Defendant: Coker, Rebecca L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Coker, Rebecca L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: REBECCA L COKER 03/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Coker, Rebecca L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bank Of America, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bank Of America, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bank Of America, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bank Of America, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer OROVITZ , ROBERT J