This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 03/17/2023 at 05:11:17 (UTC).

Bank Of America, N.a. vs Cavanaugh, Marianne

Case Summary

On 11/04/2022 Bank Of America, N a filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Cavanaugh, Marianne. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Plant City Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Scott., Monique M, Makholm, S. Marc, Scott., Monique. M and Scott., M. Monique. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5371

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Scott., Monique M

Makholm, S. Marc

Scott., Monique. M

Scott., M. Monique

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bank Of America, N.a.

887 Donald Ross Road

Juno Beach, FL 33408

Defendant

Cavanaugh, Marianne

Plant City, FL 33565-8735

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MOEHLE , KRISTINA BIANCA

Attorney at ANDREU, PALMA, LAVIN & SOLIS, PLLC

887 Donald Ross Rd

Juno Beach, FL 33408

PILIUIKO , OLEKSANDRA

Attorney at ANDREU, PALMA, LAVIN & SOLIS, PLLC

887 Donald Ross Rd

Juno Beach, FL 33408

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE

11/04/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

11/04/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

11/04/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

11/04/2022: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/04/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

11/07/2022: E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

11/18/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

LETTER TO

11/22/2022: LETTER TO

NOTICE OF LIMITED REPRESENTATION

12/02/2022: NOTICE OF LIMITED REPRESENTATION

JUDGE'S INSTRUCTIONS-INFORMATION ONLY

12/06/2022: JUDGE'S INSTRUCTIONS-INFORMATION ONLY

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

12/07/2022: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

12/07/2022: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

ORDER REFERRING PARTIES TO MEDIATION

12/07/2022: ORDER REFERRING PARTIES TO MEDIATION

COURT TICKET

12/07/2022: COURT TICKET

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2022
  • HearingPRETRIAL; Hearing Time: 02:00 PM; Hearing Location: COUNTY CIVIL VIRTUAL COURT VIA ZOOM/TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE INSTRUCTIONS ON REVERSE SIDE - DO NOT COME TO COURTHOUSEMEETING ID: 402 763 9381 - NO PASSWORD IS REQUIRED; Judicial Officer: Scott., Monique M

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2022581630; Judge: Scott., Monique M

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT TICKET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER REFERRING PARTIES TO MEDIATION; Additional Info: Date Signed: 12/07/2022; Judicial Officer:: Scott., Monique M;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGE'S INSTRUCTIONS-INFORMATION ONLY; Comment: LETTER TO JUDGE ON BEHALF OF MARIANNE CAVANAUGH REVIEWED BY CT. NO ACTION TAKEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIMITED REPRESENTATION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bank Of America, N.a.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER TO; Comment: JUDGE ON BEHALF OF MARIANNE CAVANAUGH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET; Additional Info: Defendant: Cavanaugh, Marianne;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bank Of America, N.a.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bank Of America, N.a.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bank Of America, N.a.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bank Of America, N.a.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bank Of America, N.a.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less