This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 12/03/2022 at 08:48:19 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. vs BROLADZE, TAMAR

Case Summary

On 06/28/2021 BANK OF AMERICA, N A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BROLADZE, TAMAR. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Murphy, J. Logan, Tompkins, M. Joseph, Tompkins, Joseph M and Tompkins, Joseph. M. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1751

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Murphy, J. Logan

Tompkins, M. Joseph

Tompkins, Joseph M

Tompkins, Joseph. M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

P.O. Box 982238

El Paso, TX 79998-2238

Defendant

BROLADZE, TAMAR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

POPE , MONIQUE KRISTINE

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF MONIQUE K. POPE, P.A.

4570 N Jefferson Ave

Miami Beach, FL 33140

 

Court Documents

TRANSMITTAL LETTER

06/28/2021: TRANSMITTAL LETTER

E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

10/28/2021: E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

Event To Hold All Other Pleadings

06/28/2021: Event To Hold All Other Pleadings

Event To Hold All Other Pleadings

06/28/2021: Event To Hold All Other Pleadings

Event To Hold All Other Pleadings

06/28/2021: Event To Hold All Other Pleadings

Event To Hold All Other Pleadings

06/28/2021: Event To Hold All Other Pleadings

Event To Hold All Other Pleadings

06/28/2021: Event To Hold All Other Pleadings

Event To Hold All Other Pleadings

06/28/2021: Event To Hold All Other Pleadings

Event To Hold All Other Pleadings

06/28/2021: Event To Hold All Other Pleadings

COPY OF

06/28/2021: COPY OF

CERTIFIED COPY OF

06/28/2021: CERTIFIED COPY OF

CERTIFIED COPY OF

06/28/2021: CERTIFIED COPY OF

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

10/22/2021: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

COURT TICKET

01/05/2022: COURT TICKET

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

03/07/2022: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

03/07/2022: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2022
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2022123563; Judge: Tompkins, Joseph M

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • HearingPRETRIAL; Hearing Time: 09:30 AM; Hearing Location: HTTPS://ZOOM.US/J/9580902034 MEETING ID: 958 090 2034PASSWORD: NOT REQUIRED; Judicial Officer: Tompkins, Joseph M

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT TICKET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET; Additional Info: Defendant: BROLADZE, TAMAR;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketCASE TRANSFERRED TO DIVISION O PER AO S-2021-057

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY OF; Comment: BROWARD COUNTY COURT CASE DOCKET SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF; Comment: RECEIPT FOR FILE MAILED BACK TO BROWARD COUNTY CLERK OF COURT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent To Hold All Other Pleadings; Comment: From the Broward County Court Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent To Hold All Other Pleadings; Comment: From the Broward County Court Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent To Hold All Other Pleadings; Comment: From the Broward County Court Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent To Hold All Other Pleadings; Comment: From the Broward County Court Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent To Hold All Other Pleadings; Comment: From the Broward County Court Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent To Hold All Other Pleadings; Comment: From the Broward County Court Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent To Hold All Other Pleadings; Comment: From the Broward County Court Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSMITTAL LETTER; Additional Info: Private Attorney: POPE, MONIQUE KRISTINE;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer POPE , MONIQUE K