This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 11/05/2019 at 08:58:45 (UTC).

Bank of America N A vs VELASQUEZ, MAGDALENA

Case Summary

On 01/11/2019 Bank of America N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against VELASQUEZ, MAGDALENA. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Criminal Court Annex located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Valkenburg, V.. Miriam. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2906

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Criminal Court Annex

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Valkenburg, V.. Miriam

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bank of America N A

815 Nw 57Th Avenue Ste. 401

Miami, FL 33126

Defendant

VELASQUEZ, MAGDALENA

Tampa, FL 33611

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

PALMA , JORGE L, Esquire

Attorney at ANDREU, PALMA, LAVIN & SOLIS, PLLC

815 Nw 57Th Ave Ste 401

Miami, FL 33126

PALMA , JORGE LUIS

Attorney at ANDREU, PALMA, LAVIN & SOLIS, PLLC

815 Nw 57Th Ave Ste 401

Miami, FL 33126

Defendant Attorney

MILLER VEAL , JENNIFER LYNN

Attorney at JENNIFER MILLER VEAL

11 Broadway Ste 1677

New York, NY 10004

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/18/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

02/18/2019: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

01/29/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

01/19/2019: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

COMPLAINT

01/11/2019: COMPLAINT

AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE

01/11/2019: AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO RULE 2-420

01/11/2019: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO RULE 2-420

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

01/11/2019: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/11/2019: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2019
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • MOTION; Comment: FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMEMENT STIPULATION AND FOR ORDER DISMISSING CASE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bank of America N A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • STIPULATION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bank of America N A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • NOTICE OF SERVING; Comment: RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES, PRODUCTION AND ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Defendant: VELASQUEZ, MAGDALENA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bank of America N A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bank of America N A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bank of America N A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • REQUEST; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bank of America N A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Comment: AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Defendant: VELASQUEZ, MAGDALENA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: VELASQUEZ, MAGDALENA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: 01-28-19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: VELASQUEZ, MAGDALENA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • File Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bank of America N A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bank of America N A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO RULE 2-420; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bank of America N A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bank of America N A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bank of America N A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • Judgment Code: SOOD; Judgment Description: STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2019249606; Judge: Valkenburg, Miriam V.

    Read MoreRead Less