This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 05/16/2022 at 02:06:58 (UTC).

Ball, Nicklaus vs Choi, KI H

Case Summary

On 08/17/2021 Ball, Nicklaus filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Choi, KI H. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Hinson, Carl. C., Hinson, C.. Carl and Polo, Melissa M.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6670

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Hinson, Carl. C.

Hinson, C.. Carl

Polo, Melissa M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ball, Jamie

St. Petersburg, FL 33713

Ball, Nicklaus

St. Peterburg, FL 33713

Defendants

Choi, KI H

Tampa, FL 33611

Coldwell Banker Residential Real Estate, LLC

C/O 801 Us Highway 1

North Palm Beach, FL 33408

Kim, Julia H.

Tampa, FL 33611

Park, Anne

Tampa, FL 33611

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COATS , JON BYRON, Jr

Attorney at COATS SCHMIDT, P.A.

4055 Central Ave

St Petersburg, FL 33713

Defendant Attorneys

FRENCH , STEPHEN BRADLEY

Attorney at GIBBONS - NEUMAN

3321 Henderson Blvd

Tampa, FL 33609

GOODIS , JEFFREY MARC

Attorney at LA CAVA JACOBSON & GOODIS

200 Central Ave Ste 250

Saint Petersburg, FL 33701

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

08/17/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

08/17/2021: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

08/17/2021: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

08/17/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

08/17/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/17/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

08/17/2021: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

08/17/2021: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

08/17/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

12/15/2021: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

10/26/2021: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

10/26/2021: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

10/26/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

AMENDED COMPLAINT

11/11/2021: AMENDED COMPLAINT

CERTIFICATE OF

10/26/2021: CERTIFICATE OF

COMPLAINT

08/17/2021: COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

10/26/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

09/03/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2022
  • HearingDifferentiated Case Management; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Hearing Location: ZOOM HTTPS://ZOOM.US/J/8901592416 MEETING NUMBER: 890-159-2416IF JOINING BY PHONE, DIAL 1-786-635-1003 Judicial Officer: Polo, Melissa M.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2021658614; Judge: Hinson, Carl C.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ball, Jamie; Plaintiff: Ball, Nicklaus

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Comment: ENTERED TWICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED COMPLAINT; Comment: COS 11/11/2021 / EXHIBITS ATTACHED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ball, Jamie; Plaintiff: Ball, Nicklaus

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Coldwell Banker Residential Real Estate, LLC; Defendant: Park, Anne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ball, Jamie; Plaintiff: Ball, Nicklaus

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ball, Jamie; Plaintiff: Ball, Nicklaus

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X4; Additional Info: Defendant: Choi, KI H; Defendant: Coldwell Banker Residential Real Estate, LLC; Defendant: Kim, Julia H.; Defendant: Park, Anne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less