Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 04/10/2021 at 23:00:24 (UTC).

BAKER, JANICE S - Estate

Case Summary

On 02/21/2020 BAKER, JANICE S - Estate was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Corvo, T. Vivian and Corvo, Vivian. T. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0578

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Corvo, T. Vivian

Corvo, Vivian. T

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court, Petitioners and Trustees

BAKER, WILLIAM KENDALL, Jr

Tampa, FL 33612

MYERS, KAY BAKER

Tampa, FL 33612

AMENDED AND RESTATED JANCIE S BAKER REVOCABLE TRUST DATED FEB 20, 2011

2141 Carroll Gardens Lane

Tampa, FL 33612

Not Classified By Court, Claimant, Petitioner and Trustee

MYERS, KAY BAKER

Tampa, FL 33612

Decedent

SCHUETZE, JANICE ROSAMOND

Tampa, FL 33612

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court, Petitioner, Trustee and Claimant Attorneys

FUENTES , LAWRENCE E

Attorney at FUENTES & KREISCHER, P.A.

1407 W Busch Blvd

Tampa, FL 33612

THANASIDES , PAUL B

Attorney at MCINTYRE THANASIDES BRINGGOLD ELLIOTT GR

500 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 200

Tampa, FL 33602

GREENE , RALEIGH WILLIAMS, IV

Attorney at GREENE & GREENE, ATTORNEYS AT LAW

401 4Th St N

St Petersburg, FL 33701

PATSKO , JOSEPH THOMAS

Attorney at PATSKO LAW GROUP, PLLC

1601 W Platt St

Tampa, FL 33606

HARVEY , TIMOTHY ALLEN, Jr

Attorney at MCINTYRE THANASIDES

500 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 200

Tampa, FL 33602-4936

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLING HEARING; Comment: 03/24/21, 2:00PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Beneficiary: BAKER, WILLIAM KENDALL, Jr; Personal Representative: BAKER, WILLIAM KENDALL, Jr; Petitioner: BAKER, WILLIAM KENDALL, Jr; Trustee: BAKER, WILLIAM KENDALL, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketOBJECTION; Comment: AMENDED, TO PROPOSED ORDER DETERMINING HOMESTEAD AND MOTION TO STAY ENTRY OF HOMESTEAD ORDER; Additional Info: Beneficiary: BAKER, WILLIAM KENDALL, Jr; Personal Representative: BAKER, WILLIAM KENDALL, Jr; Petitioner: BAKER, WILLIAM KENDALL, Jr; Trustee: BAKER, WILLIAM KENDALL, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Comment: 03/24/21, 2:00PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Beneficiary: BAKER, WILLIAM KENDALL, Jr; Personal Representative: BAKER, WILLIAM KENDALL, Jr; Petitioner: BAKER, WILLIAM KENDALL, Jr; Trustee: BAKER, WILLIAM KENDALL, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED VIA ACH - eCERTIFY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketORDER EXTENDING TIME; Comment: (INDEFINITELY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketJOINT STIPULATION; Comment: FOR EXTENSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketMOTION; Comment: TO APPOINT ADMINSTRATOR AD LITEM; Additional Info: Beneficiary: BAKER, WILLIAM KENDALL, Jr; Personal Representative: BAKER, WILLIAM KENDALL, Jr; Petitioner: BAKER, WILLIAM KENDALL, Jr; Trustee: BAKER, WILLIAM KENDALL, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketOBJECTION; Comment: TO PROPOSED ORDER DET HS AND MOTOIN TO DENY ENTRY OF THE PROPOSED ORDER; Additional Info: Beneficiary: BAKER, WILLIAM KENDALL, Jr; Personal Representative: BAKER, WILLIAM KENDALL, Jr; Petitioner: BAKER, WILLIAM KENDALL, Jr; Trustee: BAKER, WILLIAM KENDALL, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketOATH, DESIGNATION & ACCEPTANCE; Additional Info: Beneficiary: MYERS, KAY BAKER; Claimant: MYERS, KAY BAKER; Co-Personal Representative: MYERS, KAY BAKER; Petitioner: MYERS, KAY BAKER; Trustee: MYERS, KAY BAKER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE; Comment: DONNA S JANNAZZO DATED 2/24/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: DEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: DEATH CERTIFICATE FOR WILLIAM KENDALL BAKER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketPROBATE NEW CASE FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO RULE 2-420; Additional Info: Beneficiary: BAKER, WILLIAM KENDALL, Jr; Beneficiary: MYERS, KAY BAKER; Claimant: MYERS, KAY BAKER; Co-Personal Representative: MYERS, KAY BAKER; Personal Representative: BAKER, WILLIAM KENDALL, Jr; Petitioner: BAKER, WILLIAM KENDALL, Jr; Petitioner: MYERS, KAY BAKER; Trustee: BAKER, WILLIAM KENDALL, Jr; Trustee: MYERS, KAY BAKER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketPET FOR ADMIN-FLA RES W-WILL; Additional Info: Beneficiary: BAKER, WILLIAM KENDALL, Jr; Beneficiary: MYERS, KAY BAKER; Claimant: MYERS, KAY BAKER; Co-Personal Representative: MYERS, KAY BAKER; Personal Representative: BAKER, WILLIAM KENDALL, Jr; Petitioner: BAKER, WILLIAM KENDALL, Jr; Petitioner: MYERS, KAY BAKER; Trustee: BAKER, WILLIAM KENDALL, Jr; Trustee: MYERS, KAY BAKER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE FILED; Additional Info: Beneficiary: BAKER, WILLIAM KENDALL, Jr; Beneficiary: MYERS, KAY BAKER; Claimant: MYERS, KAY BAKER; Co-Personal Representative: MYERS, KAY BAKER; Personal Representative: BAKER, WILLIAM KENDALL, Jr; Petitioner: BAKER, WILLIAM KENDALL, Jr; Petitioner: MYERS, KAY BAKER; Trustee: BAKER, WILLIAM KENDALL, Jr; Trustee: MYERS, KAY BAKER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketDEATH CERT-OTHER THAN PRIMARY; Comment: WILLIAM KENDALL BAKER; Additional Info: Beneficiary: BAKER, WILLIAM KENDALL, Jr; Beneficiary: MYERS, KAY BAKER; Claimant: MYERS, KAY BAKER; Co-Personal Representative: MYERS, KAY BAKER; Personal Representative: BAKER, WILLIAM KENDALL, Jr; Petitioner: BAKER, WILLIAM KENDALL, Jr; Petitioner: MYERS, KAY BAKER; Trustee: BAKER, WILLIAM KENDALL, Jr; Trustee: MYERS, KAY BAKER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketFUNERAL BILL; Comment: MYRTILE HILL MEMORIAL PARK; Additional Info: Beneficiary: BAKER, WILLIAM KENDALL, Jr; Beneficiary: MYERS, KAY BAKER; Claimant: MYERS, KAY BAKER; Co-Personal Representative: MYERS, KAY BAKER; Personal Representative: BAKER, WILLIAM KENDALL, Jr; Petitioner: BAKER, WILLIAM KENDALL, Jr; Petitioner: MYERS, KAY BAKER; Trustee: BAKER, WILLIAM KENDALL, Jr; Trustee: MYERS, KAY BAKER

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PATSKO , JOSEPH THOMAS

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FUENTES , LAWRENCE E