Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 06/03/2021 at 12:57:21 (UTC).

Bair, Cynthia vs ASI Preferred Insurance Corp.

Case Summary

On 04/15/2021 Bair, Cynthia filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against ASI Preferred Insurance Corp. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Peacock, A. Emily and Peacock, Emily. A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3217

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Peacock, A. Emily

Peacock, Emily. A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bair, Cynthia

Tampa, FL 33606

Defendant

ASI Preferred Insurance Corp.

C/O Fl Chief Financial Office, As Ra 200 E. Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MAKRIS , DEAN

Attorney at MAKRIS & MULLINAX, P.A.

908 W Horatio St Ste A

Tampa, FL 33606

Defendant Attorney

DAMPF , TINA ANN

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF DEIDRIE A. BUCHANAN

600 N West Shore Blvd Ste 300

Tampa, FL 33609

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

05/10/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

04/16/2021: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/15/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

04/15/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

COMPLAINT

04/15/2021: COMPLAINT

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

04/15/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: ASI Preferred Insurance Corp.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: ATTACHED - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS ON ASI PREFERRED INSURANCE CORP., 4/26/21; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bair, Cynthia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X1; Additional Info: Defendant: ASI Preferred Insurance Corp.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bair, Cynthia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bair, Cynthia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bair, Cynthia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bair, Cynthia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bair, Cynthia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bair, Cynthia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bair, Cynthia

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ASI PREFERRED INSURANCE CORP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dampf, Tina Ann