This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 11/17/2021 at 21:20:55 (UTC).

B3 Medical vs State Farm Fire and Casualty Company

Case Summary

On 10/14/2021 B3 Medical filed an Other - Declaratory Judgment lawsuit against State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Costello, Jessica. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4652

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Declaratory Judgment

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Costello, Jessica

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

B3 Medical

Plantation, FL 33322

RAJ, MIDHUM

Defendant

State Farm Fire and Casualty Company

P.O. Box 106140

Atlanta, GA 30348

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DALY , JOHN CHRISTOPHER, Jr

Attorney at DALY & BARBER, PA

8551 W Sunrise Blvd Ste 304

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33322

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

10/14/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

10/14/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/14/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

10/20/2021: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

Streamlined Differentiated Case Management Order

10/20/2021: Streamlined Differentiated Case Management Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Comment: 10/28/2021 DEFT. STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY; Additional Info: Plaintiff: B3 Medical

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: PLAINTIFF S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: B3 Medical

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Comment: PLAINTIFF S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT ATTACHED PLAINTIFF S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: B3 Medical

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Comment: PLAINTIFF S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: B3 Medical

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: PLAINTIFF S NOTICE OF FILING ADJUSTER CODE OF ETHICS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: B3 Medical

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: PLAINTIFF S NOTICE OF FILING REQUEST OF DEPOSITIONS OF ADJUSTERS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: B3 Medical

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Differentiated Case Management Order; Additional Info: Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company; Plaintiff: B3 Medical; Plaintiff: RAJ, MIDHUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketLETTER FROM CLERK; Comment: RE: ADDITIONAL FILING FEE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: B3 Medical

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketStreamline Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: B3 Medical

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: B3 Medical

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: B3 Medical

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: B3 Medical

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Fire & Casualty Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daly, John C, Jr.