This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 06/01/2023 at 13:27:10 (UTC).

Azoulay, Moshe vs ASI Preferred Insurance Corp

Case Summary

On 01/23/2023 Azoulay, Moshe filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ASI Preferred Insurance Corp. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Costello, Jessica. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6234

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Costello, Jessica

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Azoulay, Moshe

Defendant

ASI Preferred Insurance Corp

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MAKRIS , DEAN

Defendant Attorney

HODGES , THOMAS WILEY, III

 

Court Documents

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

05/31/2023: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

05/16/2023: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

AGREED ORDER

04/26/2023: AGREED ORDER

AGREED ORDER

04/26/2023: AGREED ORDER

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

05/01/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

05/01/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION

04/28/2023: NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION

JOINT STIPULATION

04/25/2023: JOINT STIPULATION

MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT

04/24/2023: MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT

MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

03/09/2023: MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/15/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

MOTION TO DISMISS

02/15/2023: MOTION TO DISMISS

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

02/15/2023: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

01/25/2023: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

01/25/2023: General Differentiated Case Management Order

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/23/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

01/23/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

01/23/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Azoulay, Moshe;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: ASI Preferred Insurance Corp;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Defendant: ASI Preferred Insurance Corp;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Defendant: ASI Preferred Insurance Corp;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION; Additional Info: Defendant: ASI Preferred Insurance Corp;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAGREED ORDER; Comment: ON THE PARTIES' JOINT STIPULATION TO AMEND THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Date Signed: 04/26/2023; Judicial Officer:: Costello, Jessica;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAGREED ORDER; Comment: DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR ENTRY UPON LAND; Additional Info: Defendant: ASI Preferred Insurance Corp; Date Signed: 04/26/2023; Judicial Officer:: Costello, Jessica;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJOINT STIPULATION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Azoulay, Moshe;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT; Comment: AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW; Additional Info: Defendant: ASI Preferred Insurance Corp;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • DocketAMENDED COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Azoulay, Moshe;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Azoulay, Moshe;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Azoulay, Moshe;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Azoulay, Moshe;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Azoulay, Moshe;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Azoulay, Moshe;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Azoulay, Moshe;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Azoulay, Moshe;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less