This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 01/18/2022 at 17:15:07 (UTC).

Azolin Desulme, Marie S vs DR HORTON INC

Case Summary

On 05/04/2021 Azolin Desulme, Marie S filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against DR HORTON INC. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Wolfe, Mark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3738

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Wolfe, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Azolin Desulme, Marie S

Ruskin, FL 33570

Defendant and 3Rd Party Plaintiff

DR HORTON INC

1341 Horton Circle

Arlington, TX 76011

3Rd Party Defendants

CONSTRUCTION COATINGS GROUP, INC.

NULOOK STUCCO AND DESIGN LLC

PROBUILD COMPANY LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BURNETT , JOSHUA EVAN

Attorney at BURNETT LAW, P.A.

200 N Pierce St

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant and 3Rd Party Plaintiff Attorney

GROSSHANS , JOSHUA DEAN

Attorney at THE GROSSHANS GROUP

884 S Dillard St

Winter Garden, FL 34787

3Rd Party Defendant Attorney

HURCOMB , JEFFREY WILLIAM

Attorney at ROBERTS, REYNOLDS, BEDARD & TUZZIO, PLLC

5237 Summerlin Commons Blvd Ste 118

Fort Myers, FL 33907

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

05/04/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

COMPLAINT

05/04/2021: COMPLAINT

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/04/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

06/25/2021: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

06/25/2021: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

05/05/2021: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/04/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

06/08/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

06/25/2021: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

COMPLAINT

05/04/2021: COMPLAINT

AMENDED COMPLAINT

10/01/2021: AMENDED COMPLAINT

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/04/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

10/28/2021: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

NOTICE OF SERVING

12/08/2021: NOTICE OF SERVING

AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE

11/29/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE

AGREED ORDER

11/08/2021: AGREED ORDER

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

10/28/2021: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

10/20/2021: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2022
  • HearingDifferentiated Case Management; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Hearing Location: HTTPS://ZOOM.US/J/91757641087 MEETING ID 917 5764 1087PASSWORD 973927 Judicial Officer: Wolfe, Mark

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Azolin Desulme, Marie S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE; Additional Info: Third Party Plaintiff: DR HORTON INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAGREED ORDER; Comment: ON DEFENDANT D.R. HORTON, INC.'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT, NULOOK STUCCO AND DESIGN LLC **GRANTED**; Additional Info: Defendant: DR HORTON INC; Third Party Defendant: NULOOK STUCCO AND DESIGN LLC; Third Party Plaintiff: DR HORTON INC; Date Signed: 11/08/2021; Judicial Officer: Wolfe, Mark

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Additional Info: Third Party Plaintiff: DR HORTON INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Third Party Plaintiff: DR HORTON INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X1; Additional Info: Third Party Defendant: NULOOK STUCCO AND DESIGN LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED COMPLAINT; Comment: COS 10/1/2021 / EXHIBITS ATTACHED; Additional Info: Third Party Plaintiff: DR HORTON INC

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketExtended Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Azolin Desulme, Marie S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Azolin Desulme, Marie S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Azolin Desulme, Marie S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Azolin Desulme, Marie S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Azolin Desulme, Marie S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Azolin Desulme, Marie S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Azolin Desulme, Marie S

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONSTRUCTION COATINGS GROUP, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where NULOOK STUCCO AND DESIGN, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where PROBUILD COMPANY LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where D R HORTON INC is a litigant