Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 03/01/2019 at 05:59:55 (UTC).

AWP HOLDING COMPANY INC vsHARDIN, HENRY C, III

Case Summary

On 06/17/2016 AWP HOLDING COMPANY INC vsHARDIN, HENRY C, III was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Barbas, Rex. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5734

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Barbas, Rex

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AWP HOLDING COMPANY INC

2553 First Avenue N

St. Petersburg, FL 33713

Defendants

COHESIVE NETWORKS 2 INC a Florida Corporation

4224 Henderson Boulevard

Tampa, FL 33629

LRA GLOBAL HR INC a Florida Corporation

9280 Bay Plaza Boulevard #715

Tampa, FL 33619

PEOPLE INC a Florida Corporation

8838 Ladrido Lane

Orlando, FL 32836

PEOPLE INC a Florida Profit Corporation

4224 Henderson Boulevard

Tampa, FL 33629

LRA HR OUTSOURCING INC a Florida Corporation

9280 Bay Plaza Boulevard #715

Tampa, FL 33619

HARDIN, JOHN W

Lawrenceville, GA 30044

COHESIVE NETWORKS INC a Florida Corporation

4224 Henderson Boulevard

Tampa, FL 33629

LEASING RESOURCES OF AMERICA 4 INC a Florida Corporation

9280 Bay Plaza Boulevard #715

Tampa, FL 33619

HARDIN, HENRY C, III

Lawrenceville, GA 30043

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CAPUTO , DARREN MONIC

Attorney at FREEMAN, GOLDIS & CASH, P.A.

2553 1St Ave N

St Petersburg, FL 33713

Defendant Attorneys

CUSHING, THOMAS M

LEVINE , STUART JAY

601 Bayshore Blvd Ste 720

Tampa, FL 33606

KREID, CHRISTOPHER A

Attorney at 1603 ORRINGTON AVE

Ste 1675

Evanston, IL 60201

SEVERSON , GARRETT SCOTT

Attorney at MCINTYRE THANASIDES BRINGGOLD ELLIOTT GR

500 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 200

Tampa, FL 33602

MCINTYRE , RICHARD JEHANGIR

Attorney at MCINTYRE THANASIDES BRINGGOLD ELLIOTT, G

500 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 200

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF HEARING

05/07/2018: NOTICE OF HEARING

AMENDED COMPLAINT

05/04/2018: AMENDED COMPLAINT

MOTION TO DISMISS

01/19/2018: MOTION TO DISMISS

MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT

05/22/2017: MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT

AMENDED COMPLAINT

04/25/2017: AMENDED COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC HEARING

03/14/2017: NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC HEARING

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

07/14/2016: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

06/20/2016: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

06/17/2016: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY

12/05/2018: SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME

05/03/2018: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME

ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

02/05/2018: ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME

01/02/2018: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

06/20/2016: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

COMPLAINT

06/17/2016: COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

06/17/2016: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

06/17/2016: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

NOTICE OF DROPPING NAMED PARTY

07/14/2016: NOTICE OF DROPPING NAMED PARTY

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY; Additional Info: Defendant: HARDIN, HENRY C, III

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2018
  • RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Comment: DFDT-PLTFF'S- FIRST SET OF DOCUMENTS; Additional Info: Defendant: COHESIVE NETWORKS 2 INC a Florida Corporation; Defendant: COHESIVE NETWORKS INC a Florida Corporation; Defendant: HARDIN, JOHN W; Defendant: LEASING RESOURCES OF AMERICA 4 INC a Florida Corporation; Defendant: PEOPLE INC a Florida Corporation; Defendant: PEOPLE INC a Florida Profit Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2018
  • RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Comment: DFDT- PLTFF'S- FIRST SET OF DOCUMENTS; Additional Info: Defendant: COHESIVE NETWORKS 2 INC a Florida Corporation; Defendant: COHESIVE NETWORKS INC a Florida Corporation; Defendant: HARDIN, JOHN W; Defendant: LEASING RESOURCES OF AMERICA 4 INC a Florida Corporation; Defendant: PEOPLE INC a Florida Corporation; Defendant: PEOPLE INC a Florida Profit Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2018
  • RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Comment: DFDT-PLTFF'S-FIRST SET OF DOCUMENTS; Additional Info: Defendant: COHESIVE NETWORKS 2 INC a Florida Corporation; Defendant: COHESIVE NETWORKS INC a Florida Corporation; Defendant: HARDIN, JOHN W; Defendant: LEASING RESOURCES OF AMERICA 4 INC a Florida Corporation; Defendant: PEOPLE INC a Florida Corporation; Defendant: PEOPLE INC a Florida Profit Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2018
  • RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Comment: DFDT-PLTFF'S- FIRST SET OF DOCUMENTS; Additional Info: Defendant: COHESIVE NETWORKS 2 INC a Florida Corporation; Defendant: COHESIVE NETWORKS INC a Florida Corporation; Defendant: HARDIN, JOHN W; Defendant: LEASING RESOURCES OF AMERICA 4 INC a Florida Corporation; Defendant: PEOPLE INC a Florida Corporation; Defendant: PEOPLE INC a Florida Profit Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2018
  • RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Comment: DFDT-PLTFF'S- FIRST SET OF DOCUMENTS; Additional Info: Defendant: COHESIVE NETWORKS 2 INC a Florida Corporation; Defendant: COHESIVE NETWORKS INC a Florida Corporation; Defendant: HARDIN, JOHN W; Defendant: LEASING RESOURCES OF AMERICA 4 INC a Florida Corporation; Defendant: PEOPLE INC a Florida Corporation; Defendant: PEOPLE INC a Florida Profit Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Comment: DFDT'S - PLTFF'S FIRST - OF DOCS; Additional Info: Defendant: HARDIN, HENRY C, III

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • OBJECTION; Comment: TO DEFT FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AWP HOLDING COMPANY INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AWP HOLDING COMPANY INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AWP HOLDING COMPANY INC

    Read MoreRead Less
97 More Docket Entries
  • 06/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment Code: OGMTF; Judgment Description: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO - FOR; Instrument Number: 2017456809; Judge: Barbas, Rex

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment Code: NDNP; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF DROPPING NAMED PARTY; Instrument Number: 2016276385

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DARREN M CAPUTO, ESQ