This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 09/19/2022 at 09:08:20 (UTC).

Aviles, Alexis vs Ross Dress For Less Inc

Case Summary

On 07/28/2022 Aviles, Alexis filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Ross Dress For Less Inc. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Hinson, Carl C., Polo, M.. Melissa and Polo, Melissa. M.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6370

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Hinson, Carl C.

Polo, M.. Melissa

Polo, Melissa. M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Aviles, Alexis

Tampa, FL 33606

Defendant

Ross Dress For Less Inc

R/A Ct Corporation Systems 1200 South Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DISTASIO , JOHN C

Attorney at THE FLORIDA LAW GROUP

407 N Howard Ave Ste 100

Tampa, FL 33606

Defendant Attorney

KRAFT , MICHAEL

Attorney at CONROY SIMBERG

201 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 900

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

07/28/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

07/28/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

07/28/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

07/28/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

COMPLAINT

07/28/2022: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/28/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

07/29/2022: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

07/29/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED

08/18/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED

NOT OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

08/22/2022: NOT OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

08/22/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

08/22/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

08/22/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF NON-AVAILABILITY

08/22/2022: NOTICE OF NON-AVAILABILITY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

08/22/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

08/23/2022: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY NO SUBPOENA ATTACHED

09/14/2022: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY NO SUBPOENA ATTACHED

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2023
  • HearingDifferentiated Case Management; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Hearing Location: ZOOM HTTPS://ZOOM.US/J/8901592416 MEETING NUMBER: 890-159-2416IF JOINING BY PHONE, DIAL 1-786-635-1003 Judicial Officer: Hinson, Carl C.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY NO SUBPOENA ATTACHED; Additional Info: Defendant: Ross Dress For Less Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Comment: AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES; Additional Info: Defendant: Ross Dress For Less Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF NON-AVAILABILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Comment: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Additional Info: Defendant: Ross Dress For Less Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOT OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED; Comment: 08/05/2022 DEFT ROSS DRESS FOR LESS; Additional Info: Private Attorney: DISTASIO , JOHN C

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X1; Additional Info: Defendant: Ross Dress For Less Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Aviles, Alexis

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Aviles, Alexis

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketINTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Aviles, Alexis

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Aviles, Alexis

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Aviles, Alexis

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Aviles, Alexis

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Aviles, Alexis

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ROSS DRESS FOR LESS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KRAFT, MICHAEL