This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 07/19/2022 at 05:07:47 (UTC).

AUTO GLASS CALIBRATION, LLC vs Southern-Owners Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 05/26/2022 AUTO GLASS CALIBRATION, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Southern-Owners Insurance Company. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Schultz-Kin, Leslie. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5548

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Schultz-Kin, Leslie

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Auto Glass Calibration, Llc A/A/O Beth Pike

7320 Griffin Rd Ste 203

Davie, FL 33314

AUTO GLASS CALIBRATION, LLC

7320 Griffin Rd Ste 203

Davie, FL 33314

PIKE, BETH

Defendant

Southern-Owners Insurance Company

200 East Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RICHARDSON , KEVIN WILLIAM

Attorney at KEVIN W RICHARDSON, PLLC

5402 W Laurel St Ste 203

Tampa, FL 33607

Defendant Attorney

GRIFFIN , LYNDSEY CHRISTINA

Attorney at COLE, SCOTT, & KISSANE

4301 W Boy Scout Blvd Ste 400

Tampa, FL 33607

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

05/26/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

05/26/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

05/26/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

05/26/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/26/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

05/27/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

05/27/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

06/10/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

06/22/2022: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

06/22/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Southern-Owners Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME; Additional Info: Defendant: Southern-Owners Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Southern-Owners Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AUTO GLASS CALIBRATION, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AUTO GLASS CALIBRATION, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AUTO GLASS CALIBRATION, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AUTO GLASS CALIBRATION, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: AUTO GLASS CALIBRATION, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: AUTO GLASS CALIBRATION, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Auto Glass Calibrations, Llc A/A/O Maria Shidlovskaya is a litigant

Latest cases where Southern-Owners Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richardson, Kevin William