This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 11/26/2022 at 19:16:46 (UTC).

AUTO GLASS AMERICA LLC,Fletcher, Tedovious vs STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 10/13/2022 AUTO GLASS AMERICA LLC,Fletcher, Tedovious filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Perrone, M. Frances and Perrone, Frances. M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6108

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Perrone, M. Frances

Perrone, Frances. M

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AUTO GLASS AMERICA LLC

2700 W. Dr. Mlk, Jr. Blvd., Suite 400

Tampa, FL 33607

Fletcher, Tedovious

Defendant

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

200 E. Gaines St

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COLLINS , JAMES ROGER, Jr

Attorney at FL LEGAL GROUP

2700 W. Dr. Mlk, Jr. Blvd., Suite 400

Tampa, FL 33607

Defendant Attorney

PATRICH , MELANIE YAEL

Attorney at BANKER LOPEZ GASSLER P.A.

360 Central Ave Ste 700

St Petersburg, FL 33701

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

10/13/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

10/13/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

10/13/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

10/13/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

10/13/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/13/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

General Differentiated Case Management Order

10/19/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

10/19/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

11/08/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

11/11/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AUTO GLASS AMERICA LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: AUTO GLASS AMERICA LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AUTO GLASS AMERICA LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AUTO GLASS AMERICA LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AUTO GLASS AMERICA LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AUTO GLASS AMERICA LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AUTO GLASS AMERICA LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Auto Glass America LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Patrich, Melanie Yael