This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 12/03/2022 at 19:58:14 (UTC).

AUTO GLASS AMERICA LLC. vs STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 10/17/2022 AUTO GLASS AMERICA LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Schultz-Kin, Leslie. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8133

  • Filing Date:

    10/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Schultz-Kin, Leslie

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AUTO GLASS AMERICA LLC.

2700 W. Dr. Mlk, Jr. Blvd., Suite 400

Tampa, FL 33607

Reid, Dylan

Defendant

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

200 E. Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FOX , KAITLIN ELIZABETH

Attorney at FL LEGAL GROUP

2700 W Dr Martin Luther King Jr Blvd Ste 400

Tampa, FL 33607

Defendant Attorney

PATRICH , MELANIE YAEL

Attorney at BANKER LOPEZ GASSLER P.A.

360 Central Ave Ste 700

St Petersburg, FL 33701

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

10/17/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

10/17/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

10/17/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

10/17/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

10/17/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/17/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

10/22/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

10/22/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

11/09/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE

11/23/2022: NOTICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE; Comment: OF WILLINGNESS TO STIPULATE TO PLAINTIFFS ENTITLEMENT TO REASONABLE ATTORNEYS FEES AND TAXABLE COSTS; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AUTO GLASS AMERICA LLC.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: AUTO GLASS AMERICA LLC.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AUTO GLASS AMERICA LLC.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AUTO GLASS AMERICA LLC.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AUTO GLASS AMERICA LLC.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AUTO GLASS AMERICA LLC.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AUTO GLASS AMERICA LLC.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Auto Glass America LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Patrich, Melanie Yael