This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 09/07/2022 at 02:24:55 (UTC).

AUTO GLASS AMERICA LLC vs STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/27/2022 AUTO GLASS AMERICA LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Murphy, J. Logan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7369

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Murphy, J. Logan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AUTO GLASS AMERICA LLC

2700 W Dr Martin Luther King Jr Blvd Ste 400

Tampa, FL 33607

Porter, Sandra

Defendant

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

200 E. Gaines St

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FOX , KAITLIN ELIZABETH

Attorney at FL LEGAL GROUP

2700 W Dr Martin Luther King Jr Blvd Ste 400

Tampa, FL 33607

Defendant Attorney

PATRICH , MELANIE YAEL

Attorney at BANKER LOPEZ GASSLER P.A.

360 Central Ave Ste 700

St Petersburg, FL 33701

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

07/27/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

07/27/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

07/27/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

07/27/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

07/27/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/27/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

07/28/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

07/28/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

08/18/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

08/26/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

08/29/2022: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

08/29/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Comment: TO PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AUTO GLASS AMERICA LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AUTO GLASS AMERICA LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AUTO GLASS AMERICA LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: AUTO GLASS AMERICA LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AUTO GLASS AMERICA LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AUTO GLASS AMERICA LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AUTO GLASS AMERICA LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant