This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 03/27/2023 at 07:26:45 (UTC).

ATCHLEY, LORI vs HERITAGE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 12/07/2022 ATCHLEY, LORI filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against HERITAGE PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Polo, Melissa M., Polo, Melissa. M. and Polo, M.. Melissa. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0136

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Polo, Melissa M.

Polo, Melissa. M.

Polo, M.. Melissa

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ATCHLEY, LORI

Safety Harbor, FL 34695

Defendant

HERITAGE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Po Box 6417

Clearwater, FL 33758

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CONSTABLE , JAMES SCOTT

Attorney at CONSTABLE LAW, P.A.

139 6Th Ave S

Safety Harbor, FL 34695

Defendant Attorney

QUINTERO , CHRISTIE LEE

1571 Sawgrass Corporate Pkwy Ste 400

Sunrise, FL 33323

 

Court Documents

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

12/07/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

12/07/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

12/07/2022: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

12/07/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

12/07/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT

12/07/2022: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/07/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

01/11/2023: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

01/11/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

AGREED ORDER

01/18/2023: AGREED ORDER

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

02/16/2023: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

02/21/2023: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

02/21/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

02/21/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

03/23/2023: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

03/23/2023: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2023
  • HearingDifferentiated Case Management; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Hearing Location: ZOOM HTTPS://ZOOM.US/J/8901592416 MEETING NUMBER: 890-159-2416IF JOINING BY PHONE, DIAL 1-786-635-1003; Judicial Officer: Polo, Melissa M.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Defendant: HERITAGE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Additional Info: Defendant: HERITAGE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ATCHLEY, LORI;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ATCHLEY, LORI;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ATCHLEY, LORI;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Private Attorney: QUINTERO , CHRISTIE LEE;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAGREED ORDER; Comment: ON DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT *GRANTED*; Additional Info: Defendant: HERITAGE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY; Date Signed: 01/18/2023; Judicial Officer:: Polo, Melissa M.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: HERITAGE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Additional Info: Defendant: HERITAGE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ATCHLEY, LORI;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ATCHLEY, LORI;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ATCHLEY, LORI;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: ATCHLEY, LORI;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ATCHLEY, LORI;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: HERITAGE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less