This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 09/20/2022 at 07:40:02 (UTC).

AT HOME AUTO GLASS, LLC vs STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/27/2022 AT HOME AUTO GLASS, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Makholm, S. Marc, Makholm, Marc. S, Lopez, S. Susan and Lopez, Susan. S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7520

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Lopez, S. Susan

Lopez, Susan. S

Makholm, S. Marc

Makholm, Marc. S

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AT HOME AUTO GLASS, LLC

521 East S.R. 434

Longwood, FL 32750

MATHIS, CHAD

Defendants

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

C/O Chief Financial Officer Service Of Process Section P.O. Box 6200

Tallahassee, FL 32314

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE DIRECT INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KAUFFMAN , BRUCE HENRY

Attorney at THE LAW OFFICE OF BRUCE H. KAUFFMAN, PA

4409 Hoffner Ave Ste 194

Orlando, FL 32812

Defendant Attorney

CLARK , JOHANNA W.

Attorney at CARLTON FIELDS, P.A.

Po Box 1171

Orlando, FL 32802

 

Court Documents

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

07/27/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

07/27/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/27/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

07/28/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

07/28/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

07/28/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

General Differentiated Case Management Order

07/28/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

07/28/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

08/03/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

MOTION TO STAY

08/23/2022: MOTION TO STAY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

08/23/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

08/24/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

08/29/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF DROPPING NAMED PARTIES

08/30/2022: NOTICE OF DROPPING NAMED PARTIES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

09/13/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

09/13/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

09/13/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketREQUEST; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AT HOME AUTO GLASS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AT HOME AUTO GLASS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AT HOME AUTO GLASS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AT HOME AUTO GLASS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NDNP; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF DROPPING NAMED PARTY; Instrument Number: 2022427228; Judge: Judge, Senior

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF DROPPING NAMED PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DROPPING NAMED PARTIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AT HOME AUTO GLASS, LLC; Plaintiff: MATHIS, CHAD; Private Attorney: KAUFFMAN , BRUCE HENRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: (AS TO AMENDED COMPLAINT); Additional Info: Defendant: PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketAMENDED COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AT HOME AUTO GLASS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: AT HOME AUTO GLASS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketREQUEST; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AT HOME AUTO GLASS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AT HOME AUTO GLASS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AT HOME AUTO GLASS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AT HOME AUTO GLASS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AT HOME AUTO GLASS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AT HOME AUTO GLASS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: AT HOME AUTO GLASS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AT HOME AUTO GLASS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AT HOME AUTO GLASS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Progressive Direct Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Progressive American Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant