This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 09/17/2022 at 05:48:59 (UTC).

AT HOME AUTO GLASS, LLC vs STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/27/2022 AT HOME AUTO GLASS, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Murphy, J. Logan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7515

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Murphy, J. Logan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AT HOME AUTO GLASS, LLC

521 East S.R. 434

Longwood, FL 32750

KLOFT, CHAD

Defendant

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

C/O Cfo, Service Of Process Section P.O. Box 6200

Tallahassee, FL 32314

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KAUFFMAN , BRUCE HENRY

Attorney at THE LAW OFFICE OF BRUCE H. KAUFFMAN, PA

4409 Hoffner Ave Ste 194

Orlando, FL 32812

Defendant Attorneys

CLARK , JOHANNA W.

Attorney at CARLTON FIELDS, P.A.

Po Box 1171

Orlando, FL 32802

SPECTOR , DAVID IRA

Attorney at HOLLAND & KNIGHT LLP

777 South Flagler Drive Suite 1900 West Tower

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

07/27/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

07/27/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/27/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

07/28/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

07/28/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

07/28/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

07/28/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

07/28/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

08/01/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

08/12/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

MOTION TO STAY

08/22/2022: MOTION TO STAY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

08/22/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO STAY; Comment: DEFENDANT STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY'S MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS AND DISCOVERY PENDING RESOLUTION OF PRIOR FEDERAL ACTION; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Comment: COPY OF FEDERAL ACTION; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AT HOME AUTO GLASS, LLC; Plaintiff: KLOFT, CHAD; Private Attorney: KAUFFMAN , BRUCE HENRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketREQUEST; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AT HOME AUTO GLASS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AT HOME AUTO GLASS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AT HOME AUTO GLASS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AT HOME AUTO GLASS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AT HOME AUTO GLASS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AT HOME AUTO GLASS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AT HOME AUTO GLASS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: AT HOME AUTO GLASS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AT HOME AUTO GLASS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bruce H Kauffman