This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 12/04/2019 at 05:26:39 (UTC).

ASHFORD PLACE APARTMENTS LLC vs REYES, TRACY N

Case Summary

On 01/16/2019 ASHFORD PLACE APARTMENTS LLC filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against REYES, TRACY N. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Smith, E. Jared. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3756

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Smith, E. Jared

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ASHFORD PLACE APARTMENTS

307 S. Fielding Ave

Tampa, FL 33606-4121

ASHFORD PLACE APARTMENTS LLC

307 S. Fielding Ave

Tampa, FL 33606-4121

Defendant

REYES, TRACY N

Tampa, FL 33612

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BARRETT , CHARLES VINCENT, III

Attorney at CHARLES V. BARRETT, P.A.

307 S Fielding Ave

Tampa, FL 33606

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT OF POSTED SERVICE RETURNED SERVED

03/15/2019: AFFIDAVIT OF POSTED SERVICE RETURNED SERVED

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

04/02/2019: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

02/20/2019: WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION

02/19/2019: JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION

DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

02/12/2019: DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

SUMMONS RETURNED POSTED

02/07/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED POSTED

VERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON MILITARY

02/07/2019: VERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON MILITARY

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

02/07/2019: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

MOTION FOR JUDGMENT

02/07/2019: MOTION FOR JUDGMENT

E-FILED PROPOSED WRIT OF POSSESSION

02/07/2019: E-FILED PROPOSED WRIT OF POSSESSION

SUMMONS ISSUED AND MAILED

01/22/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED AND MAILED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

01/16/2019: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

COMPLAINT

01/16/2019: COMPLAINT

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF POSTED SERVICE RETURNED SERVED; Comment: WRIT OF POSSESSION; Additional Info: Defendant: REYES, TRACY N; Date 2: 03/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED; Comment: EMAILED TO ATTY FOR PLTF TO- eservice@barrettpa.com ; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ASHFORD PLACE APARTMENTS; Plaintiff: ASHFORD PLACE APARTMENTS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • DocketJUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK; Additional Info: Defendant: REYES, TRACY N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED POSTED; Comment: 1/23/19 TRACY N REYES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ASHFORD PLACE APARTMENTS; Plaintiff: ASHFORD PLACE APARTMENTS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • DocketVERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON MILITARY; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ASHFORD PLACE APARTMENTS; Plaintiff: ASHFORD PLACE APARTMENTS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK; Comment: AS TO COUNT I; Additional Info: Defendant: REYES, TRACY N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • DocketMOTION FOR JUDGMENT; Comment: FOR EVICTION BY DEFAULT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ASHFORD PLACE APARTMENTS; Plaintiff: ASHFORD PLACE APARTMENTS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PROPOSED WRIT OF POSSESSION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ASHFORD PLACE APARTMENTS; Plaintiff: ASHFORD PLACE APARTMENTS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND MAILED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ASHFORD PLACE APARTMENTS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Comment: TAMPA; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ASHFORD PLACE APARTMENTS; Plaintiff: ASHFORD PLACE APARTMENTS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ASHFORD PLACE APARTMENTS; Plaintiff: ASHFORD PLACE APARTMENTS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2019147076; Judge: Smith, Jared E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • JudgementJudgment Code: JFP; Judgment Description: JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION; Instrument Number: 2019081919; Judge: Smith, Jared E

    Read MoreRead Less