Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 02/27/2021 at 07:15:15 (UTC).

ARNOLD, RICHARD ALBERT - Estate

Case Summary

On 02/24/2020 ARNOLD, RICHARD ALBERT - Estate was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Corvo, T. Vivian and Corvo, Vivian. T. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0590

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Corvo, T. Vivian

Corvo, Vivian. T

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court and Petitioners

ARNOLD, JUDY LUCILLE

Brandon, FL 33510

BURTN, SUSAN MARIE ARNOLD

Brandon, FL 33510

HARBOUR, DEBORAH LOUISE ARNOLD

Jacksonville, FL 32224

BOWERMASTER, SCOTT EDWARD

Summerville, SC 29483

ARNOLD, ROBERT JASON

Wesley Chapel, FL 33544

VENDETTI-ELLIS, THERESA DIANE

Plant City, FL 33566

BOWERMASTER, JACK RUSSELL

Plant City, FL 33567

BURTON, SUSAN MARIE ARNOLD

Brandon, FL 33510

Claimants

BRANCH BANKING & TRUST COMPANY (BB&T)

C/O Simm Associates, Inc. 800 Pencader Drive

Newark, DE 19702

UPGRADE, INC

C/O Simms Associates, Inc 800 Pencader Drive

Newark, DE 19702

SunTrust Bank co SIMM Associates Inc

800 Pencader Dr

Newark, DE 19702

Decedent

ARNOLD, RICHARD ALBERT

Brandon, FL 33510

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court and Petitioner Attorney

BELL , DEBRA ROGANNE

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF DEBRA R BELL, PA

11131 Winthrop Market St

Riverview, FL 33578

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketPROOF OF PUB OF NOTICE CREDITORS; Additional Info: Decedent: ARNOLD, RICHARD ALBERT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketLETTER TO CLERK FROM; Comment: 08/10/20; Additional Info: Petitioning Attorney: BELL , DEBRA ROGANNE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE; Comment: SIMM ASSOCIATES DATED 8/10/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2020
  • DocketOBJECTION TO CLAIM OF; Comment: TRUIST BANK; Additional Info: Beneficiary: ARNOLD, JUDY LUCILLE; Personal Representative: ARNOLD, JUDY LUCILLE; Petitioner: ARNOLD, JUDY LUCILLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2020
  • DocketOBJECTION TO CLAIM OF; Comment: WEBBANK/UPGRADE, INC.; Additional Info: Beneficiary: ARNOLD, JUDY LUCILLE; Personal Representative: ARNOLD, JUDY LUCILLE; Petitioner: ARNOLD, JUDY LUCILLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketORDER ADMITTING WILL-APPT PR; Comment: BOND WAIVED; Additional Info: Beneficiary: ARNOLD, JUDY LUCILLE; Personal Representative: ARNOLD, JUDY LUCILLE; Petitioner: ARNOLD, JUDY LUCILLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION; Additional Info: Beneficiary: ARNOLD, JUDY LUCILLE; Personal Representative: ARNOLD, JUDY LUCILLE; Petitioner: ARNOLD, JUDY LUCILLE; Date 2: 06/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF VENUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketOATH, DESIGNATION & ACCEPTANCE; Comment: * AMENDED *; Additional Info: Beneficiary: ARNOLD, JUDY LUCILLE; Personal Representative: ARNOLD, JUDY LUCILLE; Petitioner: ARNOLD, JUDY LUCILLE

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Comment: $1,254.58, BELLLAWPA@GMAIL.COM 07/13/2020; Additional Info: Claimant: SunTrust Bank co SIMM Associates Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketLETTER TO CLERK FROM; Comment: SIMM ASSOCIATES 04/28/20; Additional Info: Claimant: UPGRADE, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Comment: $11,393.88, BELLLAWPA@GMAIL.COM 07/13/2020; Additional Info: Claimant: UPGRADE, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketCHANGE OF ADDRESS; Comment: & DIRECTIONS TO CLERK TO CHANGE ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: (DC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE FILED; Comment: ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketOATH, DESIGNATION & ACCEPTANCE; Additional Info: Beneficiary: ARNOLD, JUDY LUCILLE; Personal Representative: ARNOLD, JUDY LUCILLE; Petitioner: ARNOLD, JUDY LUCILLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketPROBATE NEW CASE FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketPET FOR ADMIN-FLA RES W-WILL; Additional Info: Beneficiary: ARNOLD, JUDY LUCILLE; Personal Representative: ARNOLD, JUDY LUCILLE; Petitioner: ARNOLD, JUDY LUCILLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO RULE 2-420; Additional Info: Beneficiary: ARNOLD, JUDY LUCILLE; Personal Representative: ARNOLD, JUDY LUCILLE; Petitioner: ARNOLD, JUDY LUCILLE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Upgrade Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where SUNTRUST BANKS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Branch Banking and Trust Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BELL DEBRA R