This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 09/13/2022 at 03:45:30 (UTC).

Arena Finance National, LLC vs BFG Investment Holdings, LLC

Case Summary

On 03/11/2020 Arena Finance National, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BFG Investment Holdings, LLC. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Gabbard, Jennifer. X, Nielsen, A. Richard and Gabbard, X. Jennifer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2356

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Gabbard, Jennifer. X

Nielsen, A. Richard

Gabbard, X. Jennifer

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Arena Special Opportunities Fund, L.P.

405 Lexington Avenue 59Th Floor

New York, NY 10174

Arena Finance National, LLC

405 Lexington Avenue 59Th Floor

New York, NY 10174

Arena Special Opportunities Fund (Offshore) Master LP

405 Lexington Avenue 59Th Floor

New York, NY 10174

Defendants

BFG Investment Holdings, LLC

C/O Corporation Service Company 251 Little Falls Drive

Wilmington, DE 19808

Boston Finance Group, LLC

12707 49Th Street North Suite 900

Clearwater, FL 33762

Prospect Funding Holdings LLC

12707 49Th Street North Suite 900

Clearwater, FL 33762

Berlin, Mark A., Jr

BFG Holdings, Boston Finance Group, Prospect Holdings, Prospect Partners, Govoni, and Golden

Golden, Jonathan

Govoni, Leo J.

Prospect Funding Holdings (NY) III, LLC

Prospect Funding Partners LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GORMAN, DANIEL E

875 Third Avenue

New York, NY 10022

MOSKOWITZ, BENNET J

MCCOY , KEVIN PATRICK

Attorney at CARLTON FIELDS, PA

4221 W Boy Scout Blvd Ste 1000

Tampa, FL 33607

Defendant Attorneys

KOENIG , ERIC S

Attorney at TRENAM LAW

Po Box 1102

Tampa, FL 33601

MCBRIDE , WILLIAM ALBERT

Attorney at TRENAM LAW

Po Box 1102

Tampa, FL 33601

BENNETT , JUSTIN PATRICK

Attorney at GUNSTER, YOAKLEY & STEWART, P.A.

401 E Jackson St Ste 1500

Tampa, FL 33602

CRONIN , SEAN PATRICK

Attorney at STANTON CRONIN LAW GROUP, P.L.

6944 W Linebaugh Ave Ste 102

Tampa, FL 33625

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

04/07/2022: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

03/25/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF HEARING

03/24/2022: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

03/22/2022: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

03/02/2022: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

03/02/2022: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

CROSS NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

03/01/2022: CROSS NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF SERVING

02/24/2022: NOTICE OF SERVING

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

02/18/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

09/12/2022: AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

CROSS NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

09/07/2022: CROSS NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY

08/25/2022: OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY

MOTION TO STRIKE

08/25/2022: MOTION TO STRIKE

OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY

08/25/2022: OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY

MOTION TO STRIKE

08/24/2022: MOTION TO STRIKE

MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY

08/23/2022: MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY

MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY

08/23/2022: MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

08/19/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

245 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Arena Finance National, LLC; Plaintiff: Arena Special Opportunities Fund (Offshore) Master LP; Plaintiff: Arena Special Opportunities Fund, L.P.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCROSS NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Additional Info: Defendant: Berlin, Mark A., Jr; Defendant: Prospect Funding Holdings (NY) III, LLC; Defendant: Prospect Funding Holdings LLC; Defendant: Prospect Funding Partners LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOBJECTION TO NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY; Additional Info: Defendant: Govoni, Leo J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO STRIKE; Additional Info: Defendant: Berlin, Mark A., Jr; Defendant: Prospect Funding Holdings (NY) III, LLC; Defendant: Prospect Funding Holdings LLC; Defendant: Prospect Funding Partners LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOBJECTION TO NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY; Additional Info: Defendant: Berlin, Mark A., Jr; Defendant: Prospect Funding Holdings (NY) III, LLC; Defendant: Prospect Funding Holdings LLC; Defendant: Prospect Funding Partners LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO STRIKE; Additional Info: Defendant: BFG Investment Holdings, LLC; Defendant: Boston Finance Group, LLC; Defendant: Golden, Jonathan; Defendant: Govoni, Leo J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY; Additional Info: Defendant: BFG Investment Holdings, LLC; Defendant: Boston Finance Group, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Arena Finance National, LLC; Plaintiff: Arena Special Opportunities Fund (Offshore) Master LP; Plaintiff: Arena Special Opportunities Fund, L.P.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Arena Finance National, LLC; Plaintiff: Arena Special Opportunities Fund (Offshore) Master LP; Plaintiff: Arena Special Opportunities Fund, L.P.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Arena Finance National, LLC; Plaintiff: Arena Special Opportunities Fund (Offshore) Master LP; Plaintiff: Arena Special Opportunities Fund, L.P.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
300 More Docket Entries
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: x3 - kmccoy@carltonfields.com ; lfuller@carltonfields.com ; KDelValle@carltonfields.com ; Additional Info: Defendant: BFG Investment Holdings, LLC; Defendant: Boston Finance Group, LLC; Defendant: Prospect Funding Holdings LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: x3 - kmccoy@carltonfields.com ; lfuller@carltonfields.com ; KDelValle@carltonfields.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: x3 - kmccoy@carltonfields.com ; lfuller@carltonfields.com ; KDelValle@carltonfields.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Arena Finance National, LLC; Plaintiff: Arena Special Opportunities Fund (Offshore) Master LP; Plaintiff: Arena Special Opportunities Fund, L.P.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Arena Finance National, LLC; Plaintiff: Arena Special Opportunities Fund (Offshore) Master LP; Plaintiff: Arena Special Opportunities Fund, L.P.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Arena Finance National, LLC; Plaintiff: Arena Special Opportunities Fund (Offshore) Master LP; Plaintiff: Arena Special Opportunities Fund, L.P.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Arena Finance National, LLC; Plaintiff: Arena Special Opportunities Fund (Offshore) Master LP; Plaintiff: Arena Special Opportunities Fund, L.P.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Arena Finance National, LLC; Plaintiff: Arena Special Opportunities Fund (Offshore) Master LP; Plaintiff: Arena Special Opportunities Fund, L.P.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Arena Finance National, LLC; Plaintiff: Arena Special Opportunities Fund (Offshore) Master LP; Plaintiff: Arena Special Opportunities Fund, L.P.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Boston Finance Group, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Prospect Funding Holdings LLC is a litigant