This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 09/17/2020 at 20:45:38 (UTC).

Aponte, Alexander vs FORD MOTOR COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/10/2020 Aponte, Alexander filed a Contract - Product Liability lawsuit against FORD MOTOR COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Hinson, C.. Carl. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5554

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Product Liability

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Hinson, C.. Carl

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Aponte, Alexander

Chicago, IL 60602

Defendant

FORD MOTOR COMPANY

1200 South Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CAREY , KEVIN JAMES

Attorney at KROHN AND MOSS, LTD.

10 N Dearborn St Fl 3

Chicago, IL 60602

Defendant Attorney

BROMAGEN , WILLIAM LEE

Attorney at BROMAGEN RATHET KLEE & SMITH, P.A.

Po Box 70036

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33307

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/10/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

07/10/2020: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

07/10/2020: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

COMPLAINT

07/10/2020: COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketDISCLOSURE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Aponte, Alexander

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketORDER; Comment: STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER 09/10/20 CCS; Additional Info: Defendant: FORD MOTOR COMPANY; Plaintiff: Aponte, Alexander; Private Attorney: BROMAGEN , WILLIAM LEE; Private Attorney: CAREY , KEVIN JAMES; Date 2: 09/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Defendant: FORD MOTOR COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Defendant: FORD MOTOR COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Defendant: FORD MOTOR COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPIES; Additional Info: Defendant: FORD MOTOR COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketREPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: FORD MOTOR COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Defendant: FORD MOTOR COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Aponte, Alexander

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Aponte, Alexander

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Aponte, Alexander

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Aponte, Alexander

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketINTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Aponte, Alexander

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Aponte, Alexander

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Aponte, Alexander

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Aponte, Alexander

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X1 - kcarey@consumerlawcenter.com ; ngerani@consumerlawcenter.com ; nordaz@consumerlawcenter.com ; Additional Info: Defendant: FORD MOTOR COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less