This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 08/07/2022 at 11:48:08 (UTC).

Apex Roofing & Restoration Llc vs United Services Automobile Association

Case Summary

On 06/30/2022 Apex Roofing Restoration Llc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against United Services Automobile Association. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Perrone, M. Frances and Perrone, Frances. M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6552

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Perrone, M. Frances

Perrone, Frances. M

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Apex Roofing & Restoration Llc

501 East Las Olas Blvd Suite 200/300

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Wendel Debriz

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Defendant

United Services Automobile Association

200 East Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOHAMMAD , SAMEER FAISAL

Attorney at KATRANIS, WALD & GARNER, PLLC

501 E Las Olas Blvd Ste 200

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

06/30/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

06/30/2022: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION

06/30/2022: NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

06/30/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

06/30/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

06/30/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/30/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

07/01/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

07/01/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

07/12/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

MOTION TO DISMISS

08/01/2022: MOTION TO DISMISS

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS; Additional Info: Defendant: United Services Automobile Association

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: United Services Automobile Association

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Apex Roofing & Restoration Llc; Plaintiff: Wendel Debriz

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Apex Roofing & Restoration Llc; Plaintiff: Wendel Debriz

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Apex Roofing & Restoration Llc; Plaintiff: Wendel Debriz

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Apex Roofing & Restoration Llc; Plaintiff: Wendel Debriz

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Apex Roofing & Restoration Llc; Plaintiff: Wendel Debriz

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Apex Roofing & Restoration Llc; Plaintiff: Wendel Debriz

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Apex Roofing & Restoration Llc; Plaintiff: Wendel Debriz

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Apex Roofing & Restoration Llc; Plaintiff: Wendel Debriz

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where APEX ROOFING AND RESTORATION LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF- FOR HAZLEY, CLARK AS ASSIGNEE OF- FOR HAZLEY, DEBBIE is a litigant

Latest cases where United Services Automobile Association is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MOHAMMAD , SAMEER FAISAL