This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 03/22/2023 at 03:14:15 (UTC).

Apex Roofing & Restoration Llc vs Citizens Property Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 05/27/2022 Apex Roofing Restoration Llc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Citizens Property Insurance Company. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5700

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Apex Roofing & Restoration Llc

501 East Las Olas Blvd Suite 200/300

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Christine Hackett

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Defendant

Citizens Property Insurance Company

200 East Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SACKS , JORDAN KARL

Attorney at KATRANIS, WALD & GARNER, PLLC

501 E Las Olas Blvd

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Defendant Attorney

BARRY , RICHARD LEO

Attorney at GRAYROBINSON, P.A.

301 E Pine St Ste 1400

Orlando, FL 32801-2741

 

Court Documents

RESPONSE

03/14/2023: RESPONSE

COURT TICKET

03/13/2023: COURT TICKET

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

02/14/2023: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF HEARING

11/04/2022: NOTICE OF HEARING

MOTION TO DISMISS

09/20/2022: MOTION TO DISMISS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

08/17/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

07/27/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

NO SUMMONS ISSUED

06/07/2022: NO SUMMONS ISSUED

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

06/06/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

General Differentiated Case Management Order

05/27/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

05/27/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/27/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

05/27/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

05/27/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

05/27/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

05/27/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION

05/27/2022: NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

05/27/2022: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE; Comment: TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Apex Roofing & Restoration Llc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • HearingJAWS HEARING; Hearing Time: 02:00 PM; Hearing Location: 800 E. Twiggs St. Tampa, FL 33602 Room 304View Case Hearing Notice for Additional Details, as applicable.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT TICKET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Defendant: Citizens Property Insurance Company;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Additional Info: Defendant: Citizens Property Insurance Company;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS; Additional Info: Defendant: Citizens Property Insurance Company;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Citizens Property Insurance Company;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNO SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: (FEES PAID)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Apex Roofing & Restoration Llc; Plaintiff: Christine Hackett; Private Attorney: SACKS , JORDAN KARL;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Apex Roofing & Restoration Llc; Plaintiff: Christine Hackett;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Apex Roofing & Restoration Llc; Plaintiff: Christine Hackett;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Apex Roofing & Restoration Llc; Plaintiff: Christine Hackett;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Apex Roofing & Restoration Llc; Plaintiff: Christine Hackett;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Apex Roofing & Restoration Llc; Plaintiff: Christine Hackett;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Apex Roofing & Restoration Llc; Plaintiff: Christine Hackett;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Apex Roofing & Restoration Llc; Plaintiff: Christine Hackett;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Apex Roofing & Restoration Llc; Plaintiff: Christine Hackett;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Citizens Property Insurance Company;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less