This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 08/11/2022 at 02:15:08 (UTC).

APEX AUTO GLASS LLC vs Protective Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 05/01/2022 APEX AUTO GLASS LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Protective Insurance Company. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Lopez, S. Susan and Lopez, Susan. S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8280

  • Filing Date:

    05/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Lopez, S. Susan

Lopez, Susan. S

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Apex Auto Glass Llc A/A/O Concepts Logistics

102 Poinciana Lane

Largo, FL 33770

APEX AUTO GLASS LLC

102 Poinciana Lane

Largo, FL 33770

CONCEPTS LOGISTICS

Defendant

Protective Insurance Company

200 East Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VASILAROS , JACK WILLIAM

Attorney at UNITED LAW GROUP PA

1920 West Bay Dr Ste 1

Largo, FL 33770

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

05/01/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

05/01/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

05/01/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

05/01/2022: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

05/01/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

05/01/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/01/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

05/02/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

05/02/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

06/01/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

06/24/2022: MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

MOTION TO DISMISS

06/24/2022: MOTION TO DISMISS

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS; Additional Info: Defendant: Protective Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER; Additional Info: Defendant: Protective Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Protective Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: APEX AUTO GLASS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: APEX AUTO GLASS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: APEX AUTO GLASS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: APEX AUTO GLASS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: APEX AUTO GLASS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: APEX AUTO GLASS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: APEX AUTO GLASS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: APEX AUTO GLASS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where APEX AUTO GLASS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where PROTECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VASILAROS , JACK WILLIAM