This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 08/30/2021 at 19:55:16 (UTC).

Apex Auto Glass Llc vs Allstate Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 07/06/2021 Apex Auto Glass Llc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Allstate Insurance Company. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Criminal Court Annex located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Valkenburg, V.. Miriam and Valkenburg, Miriam. V.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4143

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Valkenburg, V.. Miriam

Valkenburg, Miriam. V.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Apex Auto Glass Llc A/A/O Stephanie Galbraith

111 Bayside Drive

Clearwater, FL 33767

Apex Auto Glass Llc

111 Bayside Drive

Clearwater, FL 33767

GALBRAITH, STEPHANIE

Defendant

Allstate Insurance Company

200 East Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

THIBODEAUX , CHRISTOPHER YVES

Attorney at UNITED LAW GROUP OF FLORIDA

1920 West Bay Dr Ste 1

Largo, FL 33770

VASILAROS , JACK WILLIAM

Attorney at VASILAROS LAW LLC

111 Bayside Dr

Clearwater Beach, FL 33767

Defendant Attorney

TUCKER, SARAH NICOLE

Attorney at BANKER LOPEZ GASSLER P.A.

1200 S Pine Island Rd Ste 170

Plantation, FL 33324

 

Court Documents

General Differentiated Case Management Order

07/09/2021: General Differentiated Case Management Order

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/06/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

07/06/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Comment: AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Apex Auto Glass Llc; Plaintiff: GALBRAITH, STEPHANIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2021
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Additional Info: Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME; Comment: TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY; Additional Info: Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME; Comment: TO RESPOND TO PLTFS COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Apex Auto Glass Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Apex Auto Glass Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Apex Auto Glass Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Apex Auto Glass Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Apex Auto Glass Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Apex Auto Glass Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Apex Auto Glass Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Apex Auto Glass Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where APEX AUTO GLASS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Allstate Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VASILAROS , JACK WILLIAM

Latest cases represented by Lawyer THIBODEAUX CHRISTOPHER Y