This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 04/27/2023 at 16:42:35 (UTC).

Apex Auto Glass Llc vs Peak Property And Casualty Insurance Corporation

Case Summary

On 01/26/2023 Apex Auto Glass Llc filed an Other lawsuit against Peak Property And Casualty Insurance Corporation. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Costello, Jessica. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7122

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Costello, Jessica

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Apex Auto Glass Llc

CONNERS, LORI

Defendant

Peak Property And Casualty Insurance Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VASILAROS , JACK WILLIAM

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

01/26/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

01/26/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

01/26/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

01/26/2023: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

01/26/2023: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

01/26/2023: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/26/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

General Differentiated Case Management Order

01/27/2023: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

01/27/2023: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

02/08/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

02/17/2023: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

02/17/2023: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

02/21/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

02/21/2023: RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

PRIVILEGE LOG

02/21/2023: PRIVILEGE LOG

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRIVILEGE LOG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: Peak Property And Casualty Insurance Corporation;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Apex Auto Glass Llc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Apex Auto Glass Llc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Apex Auto Glass Llc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Apex Auto Glass Llc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Apex Auto Glass Llc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Apex Auto Glass Llc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Apex Auto Glass Llc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Apex Auto Glass Llc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less