This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 06/04/2023 at 00:59:30 (UTC).

Apex Auto Glass LLC vs Peak Property And Casualty Insurance Corporation

Case Summary

On 01/26/2023 Apex Auto Glass LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Peak Property And Casualty Insurance Corporation. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Black, Melissa. C and Black, C. Melissa. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7100

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Black, Melissa. C

Black, C. Melissa

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Apex Auto Glass LLC

Humphrey, Latecia

Defendant

Peak Property And Casualty Insurance Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VASILAROS , JACK WILLIAM

Defendant Attorney

KIELICH , ROY A

 

Court Documents

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

05/11/2023: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

04/17/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

RESPONSE

04/12/2023: RESPONSE

PRIVILEGE LOG

03/24/2023: PRIVILEGE LOG

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

03/24/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

03/24/2023: RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

02/16/2023: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

02/16/2023: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/16/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

02/08/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

01/27/2023: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

01/27/2023: General Differentiated Case Management Order

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/26/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

01/26/2023: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

01/26/2023: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

01/26/2023: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

01/26/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

01/26/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Comment: AMENDED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Apex Auto Glass LLC; Plaintiff: Humphrey, Latecia;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Defendant: Peak Property And Casualty Insurance Corporation; Private Attorney: KIELICH , ROY A;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE; Additional Info: Defendant: Peak Property And Casualty Insurance Corporation;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRIVILEGE LOG; Additional Info: Defendant: Peak Property And Casualty Insurance Corporation; Private Attorney: KIELICH , ROY A;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Defendant: Peak Property And Casualty Insurance Corporation; Private Attorney: KIELICH , ROY A;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Peak Property And Casualty Insurance Corporation; Private Attorney: KIELICH , ROY A;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: Peak Property And Casualty Insurance Corporation;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Defendant: Peak Property And Casualty Insurance Corporation;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Peak Property And Casualty Insurance Corporation;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Apex Auto Glass LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Apex Auto Glass LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Apex Auto Glass LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Apex Auto Glass LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Apex Auto Glass LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Apex Auto Glass LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Apex Auto Glass LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Apex Auto Glass LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less