This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 09/18/2022 at 06:25:50 (UTC).

Apex Auto Glass Llc vs Liberty Mutual Personal Insurance Comapny

Case Summary

On 07/30/2022 Apex Auto Glass Llc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Liberty Mutual Personal Insurance Comapny. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Bagge-Hernandez, Michael. C and Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9512

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael

Bagge-Hernandez, Michael. C

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Apex Auto Glass Llc

102 Poinciana Lane

Largo, FL 33770

FLEMING, KEITH

Defendant

Liberty Mutual Personal Insurance Comapny

200 East Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VASILAROS , JACK WILLIAM

Attorney at UNITED LAW GROUP PA

1920 West Bay Dr Ste 1

Largo, FL 33770

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

07/30/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

07/30/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

07/30/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

07/30/2022: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

07/30/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

07/30/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/30/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

08/02/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

08/02/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

08/22/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

08/25/2022: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Comment: AMENDED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Apex Auto Glass Llc; Plaintiff: FLEMING, KEITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Liberty Mutual Personal Insurance Comapny

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Apex Auto Glass Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Apex Auto Glass Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Apex Auto Glass Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Apex Auto Glass Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Apex Auto Glass Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Apex Auto Glass Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Apex Auto Glass Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Apex Auto Glass Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Liberty Mutual Personal Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where APEX AUTO GLASS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VASILAROS , JACK WILLIAM