This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 12/05/2021 at 08:24:03 (UTC).

Apex Auto Glass Llc vs Allstate Fire And Casualty Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 10/07/2021 Apex Auto Glass Llc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Allstate Fire And Casualty Insurance Company. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Schultz-Kin, Leslie. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2847

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Schultz-Kin, Leslie

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Apex Auto Glass Llc A/A/O Dylan Hendriex

102 Poinciana Lane

Largo, FL 33770

Apex Auto Glass Llc

102 Poinciana Lane

Largo, FL 33770

HENDRIEX, DYLAN

Defendant

Allstate Fire And Casualty Insurance Company

200 East Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VASILAROS , JACK WILLIAM

Attorney at VASILAROS LAW LLC

111 Bayside Dr

Clearwater Beach, FL 33767

Defendant Attorney

SCHINKA , JOHN COUPER

Attorney at ALLSTATE - TAMPA STAFF COUNSEL

4443 Lyons Rd Ste 206

Coconut Creek, FL 33073

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

10/07/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/07/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

General Differentiated Case Management Order

10/12/2021: General Differentiated Case Management Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Comment: AND DISCLOSURE DESIGNATION OF PRINCIPAL E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Defendant: Allstate Fire And Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME; Comment: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AND MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY; Additional Info: Defendant: Allstate Fire And Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Allstate Fire And Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Apex Auto Glass Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Apex Auto Glass Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Apex Auto Glass Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Apex Auto Glass Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Apex Auto Glass Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Apex Auto Glass Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Apex Auto Glass Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Apex Auto Glass Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where APEX AUTO GLASS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VASILAROS , JACK WILLIAM