This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 09/20/2022 at 05:55:51 (UTC).

Apex Auto Glass LLC vs Peak Property And Casualty Insurance Corporation

Case Summary

On 07/15/2022 Apex Auto Glass LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Peak Property And Casualty Insurance Corporation. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Gutman, N. Jack and Gutman, Jack. N. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2557

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Gutman, N. Jack

Gutman, Jack. N

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Apex Auto Glass LLC

102 Poinciana Lane

Largo, FL 33770

JOHNSON, BRITTANY

Defendant

Peak Property And Casualty Insurance Corporation

200 East Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VASILAROS , JACK WILLIAM

Attorney at UNITED LAW GROUP PA

1920 West Bay Dr Ste 1

Largo, FL 33770

Defendant Attorney

MOGG , DANIELLA

Attorney at SENTRY INSURANCE COMPANY

Po Box 8051

Stevens Point, WI 54481

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

07/15/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

07/15/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

07/15/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

07/15/2022: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

07/15/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

07/15/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/15/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

General Differentiated Case Management Order

07/18/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

07/18/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

07/26/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

07/29/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

07/29/2022: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

08/25/2022: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

09/08/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Apex Auto Glass LLC; Plaintiff: JOHNSON, BRITTANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Peak Property And Casualty Insurance Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Peak Property And Casualty Insurance Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Apex Auto Glass LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Apex Auto Glass LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Apex Auto Glass LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Apex Auto Glass LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Apex Auto Glass LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Apex Auto Glass LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Apex Auto Glass LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Apex Auto Glass LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where APEX AUTO GLASS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Peak Property and Casualty Insurance Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VASILAROS , JACK WILLIAM